May 13, 2010 |
Filing
156
STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/12/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing
154
ORDER Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; parties consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/11/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing
146
ORDER requiring Plaintiff to be available via telephone for April 14, 2010 settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vadas on 4/7/10. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
143
STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2010.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/26/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
140
ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference re: Further Settlement for Wednesday, March 17, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
|
October 20, 2009 |
Filing
129
REPORT OF PRO SE PRISONER EARLY SETTLEMENT PROCEEDING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/20/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
123
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2009 at 03:45 PM., via telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/2/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing
121
ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus issued to transport Plaintiff Jumah Ali-Thomas Moore. Settlement Conference set for 09/22/09 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/14/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 9, 2009 |
Filing
119
ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2009 09:00 AM. Solano State Prison. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/9/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009) Modified on 9/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing
115
ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 83 Motion for Reconsideration; GRANTING 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Photocopy Exhibits to Opposition; GRANTING 88 Moti on for Reconsideration; GRANTING 91 Motion for Additional Exhibits; GRANTING 97 Motion to Seal and for Protective Order. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant. Thomas are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court's Order of 02/25/09 is VACA TED IN PART as to Defendants Mathews, Arroyo, and Vogel-Pace; No later than (7) seven days of the date of this Order, Deputy Attorney General Trace O. Maiorino shall make an appearance on their behalf and participate in the Settlement Proceedings. Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for a Settlement Conference. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing
106
WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport plaintiff issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas, on 5/12/09. Settlement Conference set for 05/19/09 at 9:00 AM (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009) Modified on 5/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
April 23, 2009 |
Filing
99
ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstong,GRANTING 96 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Global Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Time to Complete Global Settlement is Extended to 05/25/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009) Modified on 4/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing
76
ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 74 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's response due 03/13/09; Defendants reply brief due (15) fifteen-days Plaintiff's opposition is filed. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009) Modified on 3/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 26, 2009 |
Filing
72
ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING PART 51 Motion for an Order for the U.S. Marshal to Obtain Confidential Addresses of Defendant I. Grillo; GRANTING 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Requests to Defendants. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment to be filed by 03/02/09; Defendants' reply brief due no later than (15) fifteen-days after after Plaintiff's opposition. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Matthews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 25, 2009 |
Filing
71
Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; parties to attempt global settlement conference of all plaintiff's cases within sixty days. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing
56
ORDER: That a Settlement Conference is set for 02/27/09 at 9:00 AM. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009) Modified on 1/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
December 22, 2008 |
Filing
44
ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and DENYING 41 Motion to Obtain Confidential Address of Defendants C. Matthews, M. Arroyo, and C. Vogel-Pace and GRANTING 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Provide the Court with Current Addresses of Defendants Grillo, Matthews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace and DENYING 43 Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendants Pistone, Gibbs, Baez, Zamora and Tsai. Answer of Defendant s Pistone, Gibbs, Baez, Zamora and Tsai, due no later than 12/29/08; Dispositive Motions due by 01/29/09. Plaintiff must provide the Court with current addresses of Defendants Grillo, Matthews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace by no later than 01/20/09 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
December 11, 2008 |
Filing
35
ORDER granting motion 34 and setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/9/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing
33
ORDER: That no later than (30) thirty-days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff must provide the Court with current addresses for Defendants Grillo, Mathews, Arroyo and Vogel-Pace. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/17/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 12, 2008 |
Filing
28
ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/10/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
|
November 7, 2008 |
Filing
27
ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/4/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
|
September 30, 2008 |
Filing
20
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 17 Motion ORDER OF SERVICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
|