Moore v. Brown & Williamson Tobacco, Corporation et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv02150
Filed: March 23, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING AS MOOT 89 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009) Modified on 4/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong TERMINATING AS MOOT 47 Motion for Entry of Judgment; GRANTING 57 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 Motion for Reconsideration; and DENYING 83 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's Order 63 of 01/22/09 is VACATED IN PART. Case is REMANDED to the CA Superior Court, County of Monterey. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009) Modified on 4/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 72 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits C1 to C11 and D1 to D11 to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 71 to be removed and re-posted excluding the aforementioned confidential medical records (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 62 Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Summons and Complaint upon Defendant; GRANTING IN PART 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due 02/20/09; Defendants' Reply due (15) fifteen-days after Plaintiff's Opposition (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DISMISSING Claims Without Leave to Amend. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to be filed with the Court and served on Defendants no later than 02/06/09; Defendants Reply Brief, if any due (15) fifteen-days after Plaintiff's Opposition. The only remaining Defendants in this case is Lane Limited and Brown & Williamson Tobacco Corporation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/22/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) Modified on 1/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 51 Motion ; granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File; terminating 53 Motion. Plaintiff to file his amendment to the complaint by 01/05/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008) Modified on 12/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 49 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 17, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 45 Motion for Clerk to Issue Summons and for U.S. Marshal to Serve Summons and Complaint upon Defendants (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/10/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Brown & Williamson Tobacco, Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?