Moore v. Woodford et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv02357
Filed: April 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE to the CA Superior Court County of Monterey. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/27/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 43 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING 49 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING 50 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss due no later than 03/27/09; Defendants' optional reply due no later than 15 days after Plaintiff's opposition (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009) Modified on 3/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing supervisor liability claim against defendant Woodford. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend 1 COMPLAINT (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
September 30, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 18 Motion ORDER OF SERVICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?