Financial Fusion, Inc. et al v. Ablaise Ltd. et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv02451
Filed: April 6, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/23/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
October 5, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 150 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 132 Motion to Stay. All matters calendared in this action are VACATED. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified on 1/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part (54) Motion FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting (73) Motion FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE in case 4:06-cv-07222-SBA; granting in part and denying in part (106) Motion FOR A CASE MANAGE MENT ORDER; granting (125) Motion FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE in case 4:06-cv-02451-SBA; granting in part and denying in part (43) Motion FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; granting (64) Motion FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE(lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008) Modified on 10/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Fusion, Inc. et al v. Ablaise Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?