S.J. Amoroso Construction Company, Inc. v. Executive Risk Indemnity Inc.

Case Number: 4:2006cv02572
Filed: April 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG finding as moot 148 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; finding as moot 152 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 154 Motion for Reconsideration (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
March 1, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the Settlement Conference has been CONTINUED to 05/21/10 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010) Modified on 3/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 03/19/2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 2/17/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Saundra Brwon Armstrong, on 12/11/09. ***Civil Case Terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009) Modified on 12/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 87 Motion for Taxation of Costs. The Clerk's tax of costs should be reduced by $363.78 for a total. of $ 5,266.98, against SJA Amoroso Construction Company. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009) Modified on 4/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.J. Amoroso Construction Company, Inc. v. Executive Risk Indemnity Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?