Manning v. City of Rohnert Park et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv03435
Filed: May 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and Memorandum Opinion granting 69 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil. (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009) Modified on 3/4/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following February 11, 2009 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 2/12/09. (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 2, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Complete Copy of Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 2/2/09. (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
November 6, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 3, 2008. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 11/5/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
September 24, 2008 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/24/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. City of Rohnert Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?