Fowler v. Potter et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv04716
Filed: August 3, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: dismissal. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008) Modified on 12/11/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Settlement and General Release. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/4/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008) Modified on 11/7/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/10/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion in Limine; denying 97 Motion in Limine (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 8, 2008 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/7/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?