Californians for Disability Rights, Inc. et al v. California Department of Transportation et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv05125
Filed: August 23, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2010 526 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 463 Declaration in Support, filed by Ben Rockwell, Dmitri Belser, Californians for Disability Rights, Inc., California Council of the Blind. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on September 20, 2010. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
June 16, 2010 521 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES re 516 Brief,, filed by California Department of Transportation, Will Kempton, 517 Errata filed by California Department of Transportation, Will Kempton. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/16/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 2, 2010 515 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 482 MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement Agreement in Class Action Lawsuit ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 27, 2010 512 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 460 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Ben Rockwell, Dmitri Belser, Californians for Disability Rights, Inc., California Council of the Blind. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/27/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
April 5, 2010 481 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING re 460 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Hearing set for 05/13/10 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Opposition due by 04/22/10. Reply to Opposition due by 04/29/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, on 4/5/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010) Modified on 4/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 453 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 04/27/10 at 1:00 PM (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2009 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re 451 Stipulation and Request Regarding Deadline for Submitting Settlement Agreement. The Deadline for Submitting the Class Settlement Agreement and Filing the Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Settlement is EXTENDED to 12/22/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009) Modified on 12/31/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 450 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That the deadline for submitting the class settlement agreement and filing the motion for preliminary approval of the class settlement is EXTENDED to 12/21/09 re 448 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/17/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) Modified on 12/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2009 433 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FILINGS OF STIPULATIONS AND CERTIFICATION OF MEET AND CONFER: That the Court's Order 430 is VACATED. The parties are to appear before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for a MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Scheduled for 0922/09 at 1:30 PM. The trial date shall resume on 10/05/09 at 8:30 AM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009) Modified on 9/24/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2009 431 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING Plaintiffs Access to the Federal Building for Equipment and Demonstrative Devices for Use at Trial re 429 Notice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009) Modified on 9/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2009 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING Plaintiffs Access to the Federal Building for Equipment and Demonstrative Devices to Use at Trial re 427 Notice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/16/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009) Modified on 9/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2009 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 414 Motion to Strike; FINDING AS MOOT 415 Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion to Strike. Parties shall refrain from further unauthorized filings (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009) Modified on 9/16/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 420 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING Defendants' Motion on Plaintiffs' Legal Claims to Survey Facilities re 405 Trial Brief. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/14/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That parties may file Reply Briefs in Support of 378 , 381 Motions in Limine by 12:00 P.M., on 08/27/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/26/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2009 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Clarifying Order re Motion in Limine re 372 Request for Clarification and/or to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009) Modified on 8/19/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2009 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That the Pretrial Preparation Order is Modified with respect to Motions in Limine re 243 Case Management Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/4/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009) Modified on 8/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 330 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/10/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2009 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 309 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, on 5/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009) Modified on 5/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 306 Letter, filed by Ben Rockwell, Dmitri Belser, Californians for Disability Rights, Inc., California Council of the Blind. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/30/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 29, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 294 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; DENYING 294 Motion for Coordination (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009) Modified on 4/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 305 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER: That Caltrans shall notify Plaintiffs by 05/25/09 as to which of the locations identified in the 2007 survey it claims it has no legal liability for because of third party ownership or maintenance obligations re 293 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, on 4/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING AS MOOT 288 Motion to Strike; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 251 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 259 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING AS MOOT 274 Motion to Strike. The hearing set for 05/20/09 at 1:00 PM is VACATED (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009) Modified on 4/1/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2009 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstong, GRANTING 262 Motion for Consolidation of Hearings. Motion hearing set for 03/24/09 at 1:00 PM (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009) Modified on 2/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2009 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION re 252 Letter filed by Ben Rockwell, California Department of Transportation, Dmitri Belser, Californians for Disability Rights, Inc., Will Kempton, California Council of the Blind. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/23/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 11, 2009 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 252 Letter filed by Ben Rockwell, California Department of Transportation, Dmitri Belser, Californians for Disability Rights, Inc., Will Kempton, California Council of the Blind. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/11/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
December 18, 2008 245 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/18/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 16, 2008 244 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER: That the Motion to Compel is GRANTED as to requests numbers 53-61 & 63, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as to request number 62 WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DENIED as to request number 64, and the request to produce a 30(b)(6) witness is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, re 240 Letter, 239 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008) Modified on 12/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2008 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 208 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2008 235 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Californians for Disability Rights, Inc. et al v. California Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?