Garrett v. Runnels

Case Number: 4:2006cv05182
Filed: August 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CERTIFICAT OF APPEALABILTY. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/19/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
December 3, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENIED as moot 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File; DENIED as moot 63 Motion ; DENIED as moot 64 Motion ; DENIED as moot 66 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 68 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 68 Motion to Reopen Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
March 13, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 53 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 53 Motion to Reopen Case; terminating 57 Motion (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
August 27, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Notice of Appeal and DENYING 45 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, entered in favor of Respondent. Each party shall bear its own costs. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/20/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009) Modified on 5/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A blank prisoner civil right complaint form mailed to Petitioner. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009) Modified on 2/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 29 Motion for Copy of Transcripts in Santa Cruz Cases. Respondent shall serve Petitioner with copy of Exhibits within (30) thirty-days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/13/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?