Ramkissoon v. AOL LLC

Case Number: 4:2006cv05866
Filed: September 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2011 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 22, 2011 242 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 6/28/2011.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/22/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 9, 2011 237 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 236 Stipulation filed by Doe 1, AOL LLC, Doe 2. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 31, 2011 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/11/2011.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/31/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
December 28, 2010 229 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 227 Stipulation filed by Doe 1, AOL LLC. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
November 15, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION re 209 Letter, filed by Kasadore Ramkissoon. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 11/12/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 8, 2010 213 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 206 Stipulation filed by Kasadore Ramkissoon, AOL LLC. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/5/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
October 13, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AOL LLC. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/12/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 12, 2010 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
July 27, 2010 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART re 179 Joint Letter Brief Requesting Resolution of Discovery Disputes filed by AOL LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/27/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
June 23, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 163 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
May 12, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/12/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 7, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 159 Motion ENTRY OF ORDER OF PRETRIAL PREPARATION (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
February 2, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 80 Motion to Implement the Ninth Circuit's Mandate; DENYING 100 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; DENYING 133 Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiff Ramkissoon is DISMISSED as a Party-Plaintiff Without Prejudice. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010) Modified on 2/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 140 Motion for Leave to File Surrely. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/28/09 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING THE USA TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/26/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009) Modified on 10/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF. Supplemental Reply Brief due no later than 10/30/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 100 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Responses due by 9/29/2009. Replies due by 10/13/2009. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2009 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/25/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
July 13, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/13/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 6, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That Defendant's Supplemental Briefing is due by 07/15/09; Plaintiff shall Respond to Supplemental Briefing by no later than 07/22/09. The Court will hold Defendant's Motion to Implement the Ninth Circuit's Mandate in abeyance pending submission of supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/6/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2009 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/28/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramkissoon v. AOL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?