Securities And Exchange Commission v. The Children's Internet, Inc. et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv06003
Filed: September 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2010 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR TEMPORARY CONTINUANCE OF CONTEMPT HEARING re 336 Order, Set Hearings, Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on May 4, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
March 17, 2010 337 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/17/2010. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 2, 2010 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 280 DENYING DEFENDANT POYNER'S THIRD REQUEST TO EXTEND TEMPORARY CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FOR CONTEMPT AND SETTING DATE FOR CONTEMPT HEARING Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2010 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on March 2, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
January 15, 2010 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FOR CONTEMPT AND ORDERING MEDICAL REPORT BY FEBRUARY 16, 2010 re 331 Declaration in Support filed by Cort L. Poyner. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on January 15 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
December 3, 2009 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TEMPORARILY VACATING HEARING FOR CONTEMPT AND ORDERING PERIODIC BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT POYNER'S MEDICAL CONDITION re 329 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Securities And Exchange Commission, 328 Declaration in Support filed by Cort L. Poyner. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on December 3, 2009. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
October 5, 2009 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Supplemental Brief From Plaintiff (correction of document #319) re 280 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt and Remedial Sanctions Against Defendant Cort Poyner filed by Securities And Exchange Commission, 314 Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/2/2009. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/5/2009 (scc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2009 (scc, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2009 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ***NO SIGNATURE, REFER TO DOCUMENT # 320 *** ORDER for Supplemental Brief From Plaintiff re 280 MOTION for Order of Civil Contempt and Remedial Sanctions Against Defendant Cort Poyner filed by Securities And Exchange Commission, 314 Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on October 2, 2009. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 309 GRANTING, IN PART, DEFENDANT POYNERS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FINANCIAL DOCUMENTATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/31/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 13, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE CR-09-504-VRW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/13/09. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 10, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 286 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin Richard Martin terminated (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
July 20, 2009 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 280 FOR FURTHER FINANCIAL DOCUMENTATION FROM DEFENDANT ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/20/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 16, 2009 301 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Minute Entry re 300 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2009 before Claudia Wilkenk (Date Filed: 7/16/2009) re 286 MOTION to Withdraw MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Nasser V. Hamedani, Sholeh A. Hamedani, The Children's Internet, I nc., Two Dog Net, Inc.. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/16/2009 (scc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/20/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2009 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 290 DENYING STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
November 3, 2008 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 271 granting STIPULATION Entering Revised Final Judgment as to Defendant Poyner re 257 Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/3/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 188 , 189 DETERMINING REMEDIES FOR DEFENDANTS VIOLATIONS OF THE SECURITIES LAWS. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/3/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
February 7, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition and Conditionally Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Trial Testimony. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. The Children's Internet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?