Edward J. Goodman Life Income Trust v. Huang et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv06110
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009) Modified on 3/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2009 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT re ( 172 in 4:06-cv-06110-SBA), ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009) Modified on 3/19/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2008 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER correcting court address in document 163. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/24/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008) Modified on 12/29/2008 (kk, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2008 163 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 156 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. The Settlement Hearing is set for 01/27/09 at 1:00 PM, in Courtroom 3, Third Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 12/23/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 161 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the parties will submit a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by 11/18/08, re 156 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Settlement Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/12/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008) Modified on 11/13/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/3/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
September 30, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated:. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/30/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 10, 2008 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Briefing. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/9/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008) Modified on 9/11/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/2/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008) Modified on 9/3/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edward J. Goodman Life Income Trust v. Huang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?