Finley v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co. et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv06247
Filed: October 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2011 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part PLAINTIFFS 248 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
July 30, 2010 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re [231, 232] Staying Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/30/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 13, 2010 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 219 Defendant Plan's Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Without Bond (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
May 17, 2010 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 222 Declining Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Stay Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/17/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
December 17, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 206 Letter filed by The Boston Financial Group Long-Term Disability Plan, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co., Constance Finley. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 10, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 184 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 155 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 52 and DENYING 161 Defendant's Cross-Motion (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 145 Proposed Order filed by The Boston Financial Group Long-Term Disability Plan, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co., Constance Finley. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/26/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
December 19, 2008 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 135 GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RENDER ITS FINAL CLAIM DECISION ON REMAND. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/19/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 133 GRANTING STIPULATION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/19/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?