Bradberry v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Case Number: 4:2006cv06567
Filed: October 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 179 Granting STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/18/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
December 4, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that case C-09-2314-JW is NOT related to cases C-06-6567-CW, C-07-3407-CW, C-07-5298-CW, C-07-6496-CW, C-08-0013-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/4/09. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
October 20, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 164 DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/20/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
September 30, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 164 TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. 10/15/09 hearing vacated.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/30/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
May 12, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/12/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
March 3, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 156 GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/3/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
December 15, 2008 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 154 granting as modified STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/15/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
September 11, 2008 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (152 in 4:06-cv-06567-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, (59 in 4:07-cv-05298-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/11/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradberry v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?