Sandeford v. Plummer et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv06794
Filed: November 1, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 75 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Napoleon Sandeford, 74 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Napoleon Sandeford. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/23/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
March 18, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's Opposition due 03/22/10. Defendants optional Reply to Opposition due 03/29/10 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING Plaintiff a Third Brief Extension of Time to file Opposition. Plaintiff's Opposition due 03/15/10. Defendants Reply to Opposition due by 03/22/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 03/01/2010. Defendants may file Reply to Opposition no later than 03/15/2010. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING IN PART AS UNNECESSARY AND AS PREMATURE 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 62 Motion to Demand Alameda County Jail for Pro Per Status and Defendants Discovery of Unknown Policies. Plaintiff's time to file Opposition has been EXTENDED to 02/15/10. Defendants Reply Brief due (15) fifteen-days after the filing date of Plaintiff's Opposition (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010) Modified on 1/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 58 Motion to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 12/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 53 Request for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Defendants Must File a Disposive Motion by no later than 12/01/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
February 26, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 21 Motion for Summary Judgment as to all claims against Defendant Hal Morrison. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/2/2009 (kk, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/30/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandeford v. Plummer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?