ISCO Industries LLC v. North Bay Construction Inc. et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv07082
Filed: November 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 90 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
July 20, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 84 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
April 15, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
January 19, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
April 22, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 72 Granting Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2010 02:00 PM.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/22/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
December 17, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 69 re Case Management. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
October 20, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 67 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/20/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
June 18, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 granting as modified STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 6, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 63 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/6/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
February 17, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 GRANTING STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 2/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
January 29, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER re 59 . Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
December 5, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER re 57 . Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISCO Industries LLC v. North Bay Construction Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?