McColm v. San Francisco Housing Authority et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv07378
Filed: November 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2010 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 251 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
September 4, 2009 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 184 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 201 Motion for Disclosure; denying 211 Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 232 Ex Parte Application; deny ing as moot 233 Motion to Shorten Time; denying as moot 235 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 238 Supplemental MOTION for immediate stay of subpoenas and for restraining order prohibiting contact with plaintiff's experts (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009) Modified on 9/8/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on 170 MOTION to Quash filed by Patricia A. McColm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 5/5/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 18, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Authorizing Video Services to Enter Courtroom 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 3/18/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 12, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 10, 2009 HEARING.(wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 23, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 87 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Tony Ucciferri, Greg Fortner, Shawn Coleman, Paulette Boyd, San Francisco Housing Authority, 98 Order on Motion to Compel, 101 MOTIO N for Extension of Time to File filed by Patricia A. McColm, 100 Order, 107 Order, 83 MOTION for Sanctions FOR PLAINTIFF'S BAD FAITH BEHAVIOR AT DEPOSITION filed by Tony Ucciferri, Greg Fortner, Shawn Coleman, Paulette Boyd, San Francisco Housing Authority. Signed by Judge Brazil on 1/23/09. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 21, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF SUPPORT TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL: PRODUCTION OF "EXHIBIT B" ("TAPE(S) AND/OR TRANSCRIPTION(S)") re 102 Objection, filed by Patricia A. McColm. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 14, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING RECEIPT OF PLAINTIFF'S "EMERGENCY EX PARTE REQUEST" FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE DISCOVERY. This Order is related to 98 Order on Motion to Compel, signed by Judge Brazil on 01/08/09. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 8, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following January 7, 2009 Hearing by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Compel (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 3, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 74 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/3/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 24, 2008 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 62 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McColm v. San Francisco Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?