Gomez v. City of Fremont et al

Plaintiff: Jose Higareda Gomez
Defendant: City of Fremont, Craig Steckler, Timothy Baldocchi and Matthew Snelson
Case Number: 4:2007cv00005
Filed: March 6, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 106 Stipulation filed by Timothy Baldocchi, Craig Steckler, Matthew Snelson, City of Fremont, Jose Higareda Gomez. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/25/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
December 22, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AMENDED PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES AND TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/22/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 21, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, AS MODIFIED, TO RESET SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. Settlement Conference previously set for 1/5/11 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 1/27/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/21/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 3, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE; REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/3/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 22, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE-SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE TIME AND COURTROOM: Status Conference set for 12/2/2010 12:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/22/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 16, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 12/2/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Optional Status Conference Statement due by November 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/16/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
October 21, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/21/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
September 15, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 86 Stipulation filed by Jose Higareda Gomez. Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/15/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
March 16, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice and ORDER re 59 Resetting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 5/5/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/16/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/17/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/06/10. (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2010)
July 31, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER POSTPONING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PENDING CASE REASSIGNMENT. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009) Modified on 8/3/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Deposition and Mediation Deadlines and Further Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 3/23/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 2, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT OFFICER TOM SEVERANCE. Signed by Judge Brazil on 3/02/09. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009) Modified on 3/3/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 MOTION to extend time to dismiss uninvolved officer. Signed by Judge Brazil on 2/26/09. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following February 12, 2009, Further Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Brazil on 2/13/09. (wdblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009) Modified on 2/17/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/30/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. City of Fremont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Higareda Gomez
Represented By: Steven Richard Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fremont
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Steckler
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Baldocchi
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Snelson
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?