Kennedy v. Jackson National Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Janice Kennedy
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2007cv00371
Filed: January 18, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2011 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 321 Stipulation THAT EACH PARTY BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. Motions terminated: 315 MOTION for (1) Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs and (2) For Relief from portion of judgment awarding costs or amendment to judgment regarding award of costs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/10/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
November 17, 2010 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 301 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
October 28, 2010 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 295 Motion for Administrative Relief (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 6, 2010 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 265 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Evidentary Record, Granting 217 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying as Moot 278 282 Defendant's and Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Orders of Magistrate Judge. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 277 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 275 Letter Brief, filed by Janice Kennedy, 276 Letter Brief filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/21/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 7, 2010 274 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 267 Letter filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/7/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 6, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 261 Joint MOTION for Discovery Letter Brief Re Written Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and Production of Annuity Policy ExemplarsJoint MOTION for Discovery Letter Brief Re Written Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and Production of Annuity Policy Exemplars filed by Janice Kennedy, Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/6/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 3, 2010 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 260 Granting Stipulation Amending Deadline to Conduct Private Mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/3/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
June 23, 2010 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 171 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class; GRANTING 201 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Surreply; DENYING [225, 227] Defendant's Motions to Strike; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 229 Defendant's Motion to Decide Class Certification Concurrently with Defendant's Motions to Strike and Motion for Summary Judgment. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
April 22, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 199 Letter Brief filed by Janice Kennedy, Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 5, 2010 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 199 Letter Brief filed by Janice Kennedy, Jackson National Life Insurance Company Discovery Hearing set for 4/8/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/5/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
January 22, 2010 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 157 DENYING STIPULATION re 156 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/22/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
November 17, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (correcting briefing deadlines) re 153 Order,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION DEADLINES; DISCOVERY ORDER re 143 Letter Brief filed by Janice Kennedy, 144 Letter Brief filed by Janice Kennedy. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/16/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 10, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING - 11/12/2009 AT 10:00 A.M.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 2, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MEET AND CONFER ORDER re 140 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 28, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR COURTROOM MEET AND CONFER SESSION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/28/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 14, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN denying 103 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING CURRENT CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 117 Stipulation filed by Janice Kennedy, Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Plaintiff's Motion filed 12/11/2009; defendant's opposition 2/10/2010; Plaintiff's reply filed 3/12/2010. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 9, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 113 GRANTING STIPULATION ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
February 27, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 97 granting STIPULATION Amending Current Pretrial Schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2009 02:00 PM. Case-Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
December 8, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 93 Order, Set Hearings, 89 Letter Brief filed by Janice Kennedy. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/8/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 5, 2008 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 92 granting STIPULATION Amending Current Pretrial Schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2009 02:00 PM. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 4, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 89 Letter Brief filed by Janice Kennedy Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 12/9/2008 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/4/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 17, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, Attorney Ingrid M. Evans for Janice Kennedy added. Attorney Louise Hornbeck Renne and Steven Patrick Shaw terminated.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/17/08. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 6, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 83 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION Order Amending Current Pretrial Schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2009 02:00 PM. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2009 02:00 PM. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/6/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Jackson National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Kennedy
Represented By: Andrew S. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Tully Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?