United States of America v. Moyer et al.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Associated Fee Adjusters, Nino Gianelli, Stephen E. Trettin and Pamela J. Trettin Family Trust, Cyrus Killen, California State Board of Equalization and First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2007cv00510
Filed: January 25, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 50 Motion to Set Aside Order of Sale. Jon R. Vaught is joined as party-defendant. First American holds a first lien position in the amount of $327,162.48 against the Property. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/29/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 16, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That the law firm of Boutin Gibson Di Giusto Hodell Inc. substitute as attorneys in place of the law firm of McDonough Holland & Allen PC for First American Title Insurance Company, Stephen E. Trettin and Pamela J. Trettin Family Trust re 98 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/16/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
January 21, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That parties file briefs no longer than 25 pages by 02/10/09; opposing briefs no longer than 15 pages due by 02/17/09. The Court may hold a hearing on 02/24/09 at 1:00 PM, re 50 Motion to Set Aside Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/20/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009) Modified on 1/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2008 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2008 03:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge WILKEN on 12/2/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
September 17, 2008 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That Defendant Charles Grady Moyer substitutes W. Austin Cooper, as his attorney of record, in place of himself in pro per. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/17/08. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008) Modified on 9/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: That Defendant Charles Grady Moyer substitutes W. Austin Cooper, as his attorney of record, in place of himself in pro per. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/15/08. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008) Modified on 9/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Moyer et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Fee Adjusters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nino Gianelli
Represented By: Patrick James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen E. Trettin and Pamela J. Trettin Family Trust
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Olden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Killen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Board of Equalization
Represented By: Karen W. Yiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee P. Bardellini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?