Hogan v. Small

Petitioner: Lester Hogan
Respondent: Larry Small
Case Number: 4:2007cv00779
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lester Hogan, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
February 11, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Respondent shall file/serve an Answer to the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within (60) sixty-days of issuance of this Order; Petitioner may file a Traverse within (30) thirty-days of receipt of the Answer. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/11/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; finding as moot 31 Motion for Order to Show Cause (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lester Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Small
Represented By: Eric David Share
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?