Schwenk et al v. County of Alameda et al

Plaintiff: Tanya Schwenk and Christopher Schwenk
Defendant: County of Alameda, Carolyn Lacativo and State of California Department of Social Services
Case Number: 4:2007cv00849
Filed: February 12, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/5/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
February 11, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Compel Release of Mental Health Records 62 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 9, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 67 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 10, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 58 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/7/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
April 20, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 55 Case Management Scheduling Order, Settlement Conference set for 3/30/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/20/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 2, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2010 03:00 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/1/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA MANDATE: Issued pursuant to FRAP Rule 41(a) re 41 Notice of Appeal (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 2, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER AND MEMORANDUM: Affirming in part; Reversing in part, and Remanding for further proceedings. Each party shall bear its own costs. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwenk et al v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Schwenk
Represented By: David J. Beauvais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Schwenk
Represented By: David J. Beauvais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Sadhana Devi Narayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Lacativo
Represented By: Sadhana Devi Narayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Social Services
Represented By: Sadhana Devi Narayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?