Jackson v. Bowman et al

Plaintiff: Fred Jackson
Defendant: Robert Bowman, Charles Dudley Lee and Navneet Adya
Case Number: 4:2007cv00961
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE to the Superior Court of CA, County of Monterey, by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong., ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 10/1/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff to file reply to Defendants' opposition within (15) fifteen-days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/2/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY. Reply is due within (7) seven-days of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/27/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009) Modified on 5/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
September 18, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE: by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 17 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 24 Motion to Set Aside Default (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) Modified on 9/19/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Bowman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bowman
Represented By: Kay Keeching Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dudley Lee
Represented By: Kay Keeching Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navneet Adya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?