Mendoza et al v. Whitehouse et al

Plaintiff: R. M., E. M., A. M., Jr, Azucena Mendoza and Adolfo Mendoza
Defendant: Scott Whitehouse, Fred Doran, Mike Wood, Steve Miriani, Jorge Gil-Blanco, Aldo Serrano, Joe Riposa and Stephens
Case Number: 4:2007cv01138
Filed: February 26, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/30/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
September 24, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 122 granting STIPULATION To Vacate Pretrial Submission Deadline and Trial Date. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2009 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/24/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
March 1, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/1/2007. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. Whitehouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Whitehouse
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Doran
Represented By: Amy Wing Man Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Wood
Represented By: Richard William Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Miriani
Represented By: Amy Wing Man Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Gil-Blanco
Represented By: Peter Alexander Urhausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldo Serrano
Represented By: Thomas G. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Riposa
Represented By: Peter Pratt Edrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens
Represented By: Peter Pratt Edrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. M.
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. M.
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M., Jr
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azucena Mendoza
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolfo Mendoza
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?