Bernard v. Hornbeak

Petitioner: Kendra D. Bernard
Respondent: Tina Hornbeak
Case Number: 4:2007cv01575
Filed: March 19, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 9/9/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/11/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
June 10, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE, ORDER LIFTING STAY, Motions terminated: 58 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Kendra D. Bernard, 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Kendra D. Bernard.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/10/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
January 29, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend 19 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
June 17, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/11/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
May 24, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Directing Petitioner to File Amended Petition. Amended Petition shall be file no later than (30) thirty-days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/24/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010) Modified on 5/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition. Petitioner shall file an Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within (30) thirty-days from the date of this Order (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010) Modified on 3/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel, DENYING 47 Motion for Hearing. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernard v. Hornbeak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kendra D. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tina Hornbeak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?