Phleger v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jean Phleger
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Bank, N.A., First National Mortgage Sources LLC and George W. Hannah, II
3rd Party Plaintiff: First National Mortgage Sources LLC, George W. Hannah, II and Jean Phleger
3rd Party Defendant: Michael Edison and Stewart Title of California, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Countrywide Bank, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Jean Phleger
Counter-defendant: Jean Phleger, First National Mortgage Sources LLC and George W. Hannah, II
Cross-claimant: Countrywide Bank, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Jean Phleger
Cross-defendant: Michael Edison
Case Number: 4:2007cv01686
Filed: March 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2009 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/22/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified on 5/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2009 395 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: That the Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 5/26/2009 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/14/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009) Modified on 5/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2009 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 04/03/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009) Modified on 4/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2009 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/2/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 17, 2009 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 271 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time; DENYING 274 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009) Modified on 3/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2009 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 241 Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009) Modified on 3/4/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 200 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 207 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 211 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 245 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
December 19, 2008 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 238 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Motion Cut-Off Hearing Deadline to 01/20/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008) Modified on 12/22/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2008 255 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2009 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2009 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/18/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 12, 2008 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 204 Motion determination of settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phleger v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Carolyn N. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Carlston, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Mortgage Sources LLC
Represented By: Diane Elizabeth Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Hannah, II
Represented By: Cedric C. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Phleger
Represented By: Nicholas A. Subias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: First National Mortgage Sources LLC
Represented By: Diane Elizabeth Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: George W. Hannah, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jean Phleger
Represented By: Nicholas A. Subias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Stewart Title of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Countrywide Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Jean Phleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Jean Phleger
Represented By: Nicholas A. Subias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: First National Mortgage Sources LLC
Represented By: Diane Elizabeth Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: George W. Hannah, II
Represented By: Cedric C. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-claimant: Countrywide Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-claimant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Represented By: Gavin David Whitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-claimant: Jean Phleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Michael Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?