Perkins v. Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department J-Team

Plaintiff: Reggie Perkins
Defendant: Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department J-Team
Case Number: 4:2007cv02013
Filed: April 10, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/11/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 3, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 121 Granting MOTION to Seal Documents filed by Reggie Perkins. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/3/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/30/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 15, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued as to Reggie Perkins. Signed by Judge Vadas on April 15, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
March 3, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 100 granting STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/3/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
February 25, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying motion for rehearing 96 Motion (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 9, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 81 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Discovery (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 22, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 83 GRANTING AS MODIFIED Stipulated Request Shortening Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-2. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/22/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 11, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 granting STIPULATION re Trial Date. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2010 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/11/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
October 23, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR INITIAL FORTY-FIVE DAY PERIOD. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
April 28, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum To Transport issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/28/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department J-Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department J-Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?