Prison Legal News v. Schwarzenegger et al

Plaintiff: Prison Legal News
Defendant: Le Ann Chrones, Steve Kessler, Scott Kernan, Marisela Montes, Arnold Schwarzenegger, James E. Tilton and Kingston Prunty
Case Number: 4:2007cv02058
Filed: April 12, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 86 Stipulation Settlement of Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Cost. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
December 22, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation RE SETTLEMENT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/22/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
October 4, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 78 Granting Stipulation Continuing Briefing Schedule re 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses Incurred on Appeal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 13, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 76 Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Third Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 4, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Further Briefing on the Court's Decision Not To Terminate Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 08/04/10. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prison Legal News v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prison Legal News
Represented By: Ernest James Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Ann Chrones
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kessler
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisela Montes
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Tilton
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Prunty
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?