Piltz v. California Parole Board Commissioners et al

Petitioner: Leslie Piltz
Respondent: California Parole Board Commissioners, Attorney General of the State of California and M.S. Evans
Case Number: 4:2007cv02175
Filed: April 19, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/1/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
March 10, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/8/10. ***Civil Case Terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piltz v. California Parole Board Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Parole Board Commissioners
Represented By: Amanda Jane Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M.S. Evans
Represented By: Amanda Jane Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leslie Piltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?