Reyes v. Alcantar

Plaintiff: Kebin Reyes
Defendant: Nancy Alcantar
Case Number: 4:2007cv02271
Filed: April 26, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/16/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008) Modified on 9/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference continued to 3/7/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/4/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
April 27, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Alcantar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kebin Reyes
Represented By: Howard A. Slavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Alcantar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?