Lenscrafters, Inc. et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lenscrafters, Inc. and Eyexam of California, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv02853
Filed: April 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company's 09/04/07 Cross-Complaint is Dismissed with Prejudice as to Markel American Insurance Company and Markel American Insurance Company's 07/27/07 Cross-Complaint is Dismissed With Prejudice as to Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/8/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009) Modified on 4/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/17/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Plaintiffs Lenscrafters, Inc. and Eyexam of California, Inc.'s claims against Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. United States Fire Insurance Company terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/6/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company's 09/04/07 Cross-Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to U.S. Fire Insurance Company and U.S. Fire Insurance Company's 07/31/08 Counterclaim against Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Executive Risk Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/9/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009) Modified on 1/12/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 SCHEDULING ORDER: That the Settlement Conference has been RESCHEDULED for 3/24/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/19/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008) Modified on 12/22/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That United States Fire Insurance Companys Counterclaim against Markel American Insurance Company is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/13/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/17/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the time for Markel to respond to U.S. Fires Counterclaim is extended to 11/17/08. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/27/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008) Modified on 10/29/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/29/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/7/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the the time for Markel to respond to U.S. Fire's Counterclaim is extended to 10/17/08. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/23/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008) Modified on 9/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenscrafters, Inc. et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenscrafters, Inc.
Represented By: Richard DeNatale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eyexam of California, Inc.
Represented By: Richard DeNatale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?