Wallace v. Kiewit Pacific Co.
Plaintiff: David Wallace
Defendant: Kiewit Pacific Co.
Case Number: 4:2007cv03238
Filed: June 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 57 granting STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/6/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 46 granting STIPULATION Re: Case Management Deadlines. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/26/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST TO E-FILE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/18/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/9/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER PROVIDING NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF OF REQUIREMENTS FOR OPPOSING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Kiewit Pacific Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Pacific Co.
Represented By: Mark Steven Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?