Pishvaee v. VeriSign, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Babka Pishvaee
Defendant: VeriSign, Inc., m-Qube, Inc. and At & T Mobility, LLC
Miscellaneous: Russell Bradberry
Case Number: 4:2007cv03407
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re 89 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Babka Pishvaee. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/02/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re (84 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW), (74 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW) granting STIPULATION To Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (76 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) Proposed Order filed by Aliza Valdez, Buongiorno USA, Inc., m-Qube, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, VeriSign, Inc., (75 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) Stipulation filed by Aliza Valdez, Buongiorno USA, Inc., m-Qube, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, VeriSign, Inc. The 9/22/09 at 2:00pm Case Management Conference as to cases C-08-0013; C-07-3407 and C-07-6496 only is vacated.Further Case Management Conference for 3 cases above set for 11/17/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/21/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re (63 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW), (70 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW), (75 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW), (66 in 4:07-cv-05298-CW) granting STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conferenre (68 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) (61 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW) (73 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW) (64 in 4:07-cv-05298-CW) Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/3/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re (61 in 4:07-cv-05298-CW), (58 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW) (70 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW) (65 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/15/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pishvaee v. VeriSign, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babka Pishvaee
Represented By: William M. Audet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VeriSign, Inc.
Represented By: James Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: m-Qube, Inc.
Represented By: James Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: At & T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Beth O'Neal Arnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Russell Bradberry
Represented By: Terry M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?