Pishvaee v. VeriSign, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Babka Pishvaee |
Defendant: |
VeriSign, Inc., m-Qube, Inc. and At & T Mobility, LLC |
Miscellaneous: |
Russell Bradberry |
Case Number: |
4:2007cv03407 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Oakland Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Claudia Wilken |
Nature of Suit: |
Anti-Trust |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 2, 2010 |
Filing
90
ORDER re 89 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Babka Pishvaee. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/02/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
85
ORDER re (84 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW), (74 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW) granting STIPULATION To Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing
82
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (76 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) Proposed Order filed by Aliza Valdez, Buongiorno USA, Inc., m-Qube, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, VeriSign, Inc., (75 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) Stipulation filed by Aliza Valdez, Buongiorno USA, Inc., m-Qube, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, VeriSign, Inc. The 9/22/09 at 2:00pm Case Management Conference as to cases C-08-0013; C-07-3407 and C-07-6496 only is vacated.Further Case Management Conference for 3 cases above set for 11/17/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/21/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
|
May 4, 2009 |
Filing
76
ORDER re (63 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW), (70 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW), (75 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW), (66 in 4:07-cv-05298-CW) granting STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
|
March 3, 2009 |
Filing
74
ORDER granting STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conferenre (68 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) (61 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW) (73 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW) (64 in 4:07-cv-05298-CW) Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/3/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
|
December 15, 2008 |
Filing
72
ORDER re (61 in 4:07-cv-05298-CW), (58 in 4:08-cv-00013-CW) (70 in 4:07-cv-03407-CW) (65 in 4:07-cv-06496-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/15/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?