Lyman et al v. Asbestos Defendants (B*P) et al
Plaintiff: Robert F. Lyman and Samatha Lyman
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation, Montello Inc and Honeywell International Inc.
Case Number: 4:2007cv04240
Filed: August 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1334(c) R&R re motions for abstention (non-core)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/30/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CASE MANAGEMENT AND DISCOVERY ORDER (Motions terminated: 147 MOTION for Extension of Time). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/05/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ADDRESSING MISCELLANEOUS ISSUES. In light of the 138 Notice, the hearing set for June 9, 2014, and the trial set for June 16, 2014, are VACATED. The associated motions ( 117 , 120 , 121 , and 122 ) are DEEMED MOOT. The action for the cr oss-claim remains pending, and I will hold the case management conference currently set for August 5, 2014. Montello shall file its amended answer with its cross-claim for indemnity within three days of this Order. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/06/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING AND SEVERING DEFENDANT MONTELLO INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ASSERT CROSS-CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE by Hon. William H. Orrick re 111 Motion for Leave to File. Montello is granted leave to amend its a nswer to assert a cross-claim for indemnification against Union Carbide. The trial of the indemnification issue is severed and a Case Management Conference is set for August 5, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss an appropriate schedule for discovery and trial. On or before July 29, 2014, the defendants shall file a Joint Case Management Statement that includes a proposed case management schedule. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/19/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granted 104 STIPULATION RE STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Montello Inc. Status Conference reset for 5/19/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/13/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MDL CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER - MDL No. 875: Remanding case to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of California. Signed by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 01/28/13 (Attachments: # 1 MDL 875 Docket Report)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 70 Motion to Substitute Party, Add Parties and to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/12/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyman et al v. Asbestos Defendants (B*P) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F. Lyman
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Pougiales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samatha Lyman
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Pougiales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Catherine N. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montello Inc
Represented By: Molly Jeannette Mrowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Jhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?