Williams v. Williams
Plaintiff: Isaiah Noel Williams
Defendant: D. Williams
Case Number: 4:2007cv04464
Filed: August 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenDENYING PLAINTIFFS 238 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER Approving 217 Stipulation Regarding Admissibility of Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/19/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE REVISED WITNESS LISTS by July 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on July 12, 2013. (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING ( 173 , 176 ) MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 186 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Regarding Telephone Access. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF REGARDING DISCOVERY ABUSES by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Denying 146 Motion. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel may appear telephonically for the conference. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/1/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER re discovery dispute about expert deadlines and compliance with 3/1/13 order (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES [ECF Nos. 116, 121, 122, and 123] by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER re 124 MOTION that the Court consider striking improperly filed paper re 122 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Isaiah Noel Williams (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Hearing for February 21, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. and Granting Stipulated Request to Extend Page Limits in 116 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART 111 MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 107 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUCCESSIVE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/21/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. **See Docket No. 96.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re 85 Ex Parte Application for Leave for CDCR Representative to Appear Telephonically at Settlement Conference on May 25, 2012 filed by D. Williams. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 4/24/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS 7/28/2011 DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/29/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DISCOVERY ORDER re 72 Letter filed by D. Williams. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/8/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 THIRD ORDER RE DISCOVERY SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/10/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenDENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S 43 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 55 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION; AND SETTING NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AMENDED SECOND ORDER RE DISCOVERY SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/23/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SECOND ORDER RE DISCOVERY SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/22/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLY WITH ORDER RE DISCOVERY SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW UNTIL JANUARY 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/18/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE DISCOVERY SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Beeler on 01/07/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S 51 DISCOVERY MOTION; (2) REFERRING DISCOVERY MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE; (3) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 50 STAY MOTION; (4) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 39 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; AND (5) SETTING NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/24/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/21/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?