April 16, 2010 |
Filing 94
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending matters are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010) Modified on 4/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing 93
STIPULATION AND ORDER: That ATTM's name be STRICKEN from the Court's Caption. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/11/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009) Modified on 9/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 92
Joint MOTION Strike AT&T Mobility, LLC from Case Caption and Proposed Order, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/8/2009) Modified on 9/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 91
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC.. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/8/2009) Modified on 9/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing 90
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
|
July 6, 2009 |
Filing 89
MANDATE of USCA: That this appeal is voluntarily dismissed, pursuant to FRAP Rule 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal, as to 60 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 08-15612 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
April 29, 2008 |
Filing 88
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 63 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
|
April 29, 2008 |
Filing 87
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 84 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
|
April 28, 2008 |
Filing 86
Letter from AT&T Mobility LLC re: plaintiffs non-opposition to motion for leave to file reply brief. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
|
April 25, 2008 |
Filing 85
Reply Memorandum re 63 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
April 25, 2008 |
Filing 84
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of 63 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
April 23, 2008 |
Filing 83
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENY as moot 65 Motion to Stay; DENY as moot 72 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
|
April 22, 2008 |
Filing 82
STIPULATION AND ORDER, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2008 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/21/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
|
April 15, 2008 |
Filing 81
Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal 60 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 08-15612. Counsel notified. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
|
April 15, 2008 |
Filing 80
STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference; Proposed Order, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Apple, Inc., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 4/15/2008) Modified on 4/15/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 79
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re 78 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
|
April 14, 2008 |
Filing 78
Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by AT&T Mobility LLC (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
|
April 10, 2008 |
Filing 77
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener re 76 Memorandum in Opposition (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/11/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
April 10, 2008 |
Filing 76
Memorandum in Opposition re 65 Motion to Stay filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/11/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
April 10, 2008 |
Filing 75
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CLERK'S NOTICE)(Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
|
April 9, 2008 |
Filing 74
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2008 01:00 PM. to follow the hearing on the motion. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
|
April 3, 2008 |
Filing 73
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT, filed by Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 4/3/2008) Modified on 4/4/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 28, 2008 |
Filing 72
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Administrative Motion to Stay filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 27, 2008 |
Filing 71
USCA Case Number 08-15612 Ninth Circuit for 60 Notice of Appeal. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2008)
|
March 27, 2008 |
Filing 70
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 3/27/2008)
|
March 27, 2008 |
Filing 69
Memorandum in Opposition re 65 Administrative Motion to Stay filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 3/27/2008) Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 26, 2008 |
Filing 68
STIPULATION AND ORDER: That ATTM's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due 04/22/2008, re 62 Stipulation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/26/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008) Modified on 3/27/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 24, 2008 |
Filing 67
Proposed Order re 65 Motion to Stay by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 24, 2008 |
Filing 66
Declaration of Rena Chng in Support of 65 Motion to Stay filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 65 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 24, 2008 |
Filing 65
Administrative MOTION to Stay, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified on 3/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 24, 2008 |
Filing 64
Proposed Order re 63
|
March 24, 2008 |
Filing 63
MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2008 01:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum I, # 2 Addendum II, # 3 Addendum III, # 4 Addendum IV)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
|
March 20, 2008 |
Filing 62
STIPULATION Extending Time For AT&T Mobility LLC To Respond To Complaint; [Proposed] Order Thereon by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 3/20/2008) Modified on 3/21/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 19, 2008 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 60 Notice of Appeal. Counsel notified. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
|
March 18, 2008 |
Filing 61
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re 60 Notice of Appeal (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
|
March 18, 2008 |
Filing 60
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 59 Order on Motion to Compel by AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 44611001945. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
|
March 12, 2008 |
Filing 59
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 38 Motion to Compel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
|
February 26, 2008 |
Filing 58
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 54 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2008)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 57
Proposed Order re 54 Motion for Leave to File Williams Declaration To Correct The Record On ATTM's Motion To Compel Arbitration With Respect To Restocking Fee by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 56
STIPULATION re 54 Motion for Leave to File Williams Declaration to Correct The Record on ATTM's Motion to Compel Arbitration with Respect to Restocking Fee by AT&T Mobility LLC., Ynez Stiener, Zoltan Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 55
Declaration of Victoria Collado in Support of 54 MOTION for Leave to File Williams Declaration To Correct The Record On ATTM's Motion To Compel Arbitration With Respect To Restocking Fee filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 54 ) (Collado, Victoria) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 54
MOTION for Leave to File Williams Declaration To Correct The Record On ATTM's Motion To Compel Arbitration With Respect To Restocking Fee filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 53
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc., Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 52
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener re 51 Statement of Recent Decision, (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
|
February 22, 2008 |
Filing 51
STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION in Opposition re Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decision)(Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 2/22/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 20, 2008 |
Filing 50
STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION re in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Decision)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/20/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 12, 2008 |
Filing 49
Reply Declaration of Neal S. Berinhout in Support of 38 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/12/2008) Modified on 2/13/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 12, 2008 |
Filing 48
Reply Memorandum re 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 47
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener re 46 Declaration in Support of Motion, 45 Memorandum in Opposition (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 46
Declaration of Max Folkenflik in Support of 45 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
January 23, 2008 |
Filing 45
Memorandum in Opposition re 38 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 29, 2007 |
Filing 44
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 33 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 43
Proposed Order by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 42
Declaration of Neal S. Berinhout in Support of 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 41
Declaration of Victoria R. Collado in Support of 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 40
Declaration of Richard A. Nagareda in Support of 38 Defendant ATTM'S Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 39
MEMORANDUM in Support of 38 Motion of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 38
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
|
November 14, 2007 |
Filing 37
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Collado, Victoria) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 11/15/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 14, 2007 |
Filing 36
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 11/15/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 14, 2007 |
Filing 35
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/14/2007) Modified on 11/15/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 34
Declaration of Victoria R. Collado in Support of 33 MOTION to Stay Its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 33 ) (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/8/2007) Modified on 11/9/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 33
MOTION to Stay Its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
|
November 8, 2007 |
Filing 32
Proposed Order by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
|
November 6, 2007 |
Filing 31
Declaration of Victoria Collado in Support of 29 MOTION to Stay It's Obligations Under the Court's Intial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-to-be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
|
November 6, 2007 |
Filing 30
Proposed Order by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
|
November 6, 2007 |
Filing 29
MOTION to Stay It's Obligations Under the Court's Intial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of It's Soon-to-be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
|
November 6, 2007 |
Filing 28
STIPULATION AND ORDER: to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2008 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/5/07. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007) Modified on 11/7/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 27
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue Initial Case Management Conference, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC., Apple, Inc., Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 26
Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/2/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 25
Declaration of Victoria R. Collado in Support of 23 MOTION to Stay its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 24
Proposed Order re 23 Motion to Stay by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 23
MOTION to Stay its Obligations Under the Court's Initial Scheduling Order Pending Resolution of its Soon-To-Be-Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 11/1/2007) Modified on 11/2/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
October 22, 2007 |
Filing 22
STIPULATION to extend time to respond to complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Liao, Jung-Ying) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 21
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 20 Answer to Complaint, 18 Notice of Appearance, 19 Certificate of Interested Entities (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 20
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 19
Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
|
October 19, 2007 |
Filing 18
NOTICE of Appearance by Penelope Athene Preovolos filed by Apple, Inc. (Morrison & Foerster LLP) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/19/2007) Modified on 10/22/2007 (kk, COURT STAFF).
|
October 12, 2007 |
Filing 17
ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Max Folkenflik (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
|
October 11, 2007 |
Filing 16
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Max Folkenflik ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001348.) filed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
|
October 11, 2007 |
Received Order re 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Max Folkenflik ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001348.) by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
|
September 21, 2007 |
Filing 15
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
|
September 21, 2007 |
Filing 14
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
|
September 19, 2007 |
Filing 13
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Victoria R. Collado ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001245.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
|
September 19, 2007 |
Filing 12
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Reynolds ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001244.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
|
September 19, 2007 |
Received Order re 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Sarah E. Reynolds ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001244.) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
|
September 19, 2007 |
Received Order re 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Victoria R. Collado ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611001245.) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
|
September 19, 2007 |
Filing 11
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
|
September 18, 2007 |
Filing 10
STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC., Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/18/2007) Modified on 9/19/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 18, 2007 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Appearance, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Chng, Rena) (Filed on 9/18/2007) Modified on 9/19/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 11, 2007 |
Filing 8
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener Proof of Service of Clerk's Notice (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 9/11/2007)
|
September 6, 2007 |
Filing 7
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 8/31/2007, answer due 9/20/2007. (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 9/6/2007) Modified on 9/7/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 4, 2007 |
Filing 6
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener Proof of Service of Clerk's Notice (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
|
September 4, 2007 |
Filing 5
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. Apple, Inc. served on 8/30/2007, answer due 9/19/2007. Proof of Service of Summons in a Civil Case (Hoffman, H.) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
|
August 31, 2007 |
......Disregard this entry - case was previously designated.....CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2007) Modified on 8/31/2007 (kk, COURT STAFF).
|
August 30, 2007 |
Filing 4
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener Certificate of Service of Clerk's Notice (Lazear, Arthur) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
|
August 30, 2007 |
Filing 3
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2007 03:45 PM. via telephone. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
|
August 29, 2007 |
Filing 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2007. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2007 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order - SBA)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
|
August 29, 2007 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT; with jury demand, against Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611001153.). Filed byZoltan Stiener, Ynez Stiener. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2007 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
August 29, 2007 |
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
|
August 29, 2007 |
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
|