Chapman v. San Francisco Newpaper Agency, et al.
Plaintiff: Gregory Grant Chapman, Sr.
Defendant: San Francisco Newspaper Agency and US EEOC
Case Number: 4:2007cv04775
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 60 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Setting Hearing on Motion re 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motions terminated: 57 Ex Parte Motion. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2010 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/17/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) Modified on 12/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM ASSISTED SETTLEMENT PROGRAM. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/31/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CASE ASSIGNED TO ASSISTED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/4/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the 1 Complaint, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 11 Motion to Dismiss, DENYING AS MOOT 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint within (15) fifteen-days of the date of this Order. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 03/25/09 at 3:15 PM (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009) Modified on 1/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/15/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. San Francisco Newpaper Agency, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Grant Chapman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Newspaper Agency
Represented By: Molly Agarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?