Fuzzysharp Technologies Incorporated v. Ziilabs Inc., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Fuzzysharp Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: 3DLabs Inc. Ltd
Case Number: 4:2007cv05948
Filed: November 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 121 SECOND STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend deadline to re-open case pending final settlement agreement filed by nVidia Corporation, Fuzzysharp Technologies Incorporated, Ziilabs Inc., Ltd.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/12/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Ziilabs Inc., Ltd. and Ziilabs Inc., Ltd. terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 to Amend Caption filed by 3DLabs Inc. Ltd, Fuzzysharp Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 JUDGMENT, entered in favor of Defendant 3D Labs Inc., Ltd.. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/11/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING INDAVERTENTLY PRODUCED PRIVILEGED MATERIALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson on 8/17/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 8/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge James Larson on 3/9/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009) Modified on 3/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Extending the time to file Joint Claim Construction Statement to 02/13/09. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/22/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) Modified on 1/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 39 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 34 Motion MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuzzysharp Technologies Incorporated v. Ziilabs Inc., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuzzysharp Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: David Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3DLabs Inc. Ltd
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?