Neu v. Terminix International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Neu
Defendant: Terminix International, Inc., Terminix International Company, LP, ServiceMaster Company, ServiceMaster Consumer Services, Inc. and ServiceMaster Consumer Services Limited Partnership
Case Number: 4:2007cv06472
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 88 granting STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE [FRCP 41(a)(1)]. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/16/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re 85 GRANTING AS MODIFIED Regarding Case Management Deadlines. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 6/11/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re 83 granting STIPULATION (Further Amended) Regarding Case Management Deadlines. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/5/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 77 granting STIPULATION Regarding Case Management Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re 73 granting STIPULATION Regarding Case Management Deadlines.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/28/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 granting STIPULATION Regarding Case Management Deadlines Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/25/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re 66 granting STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/1/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neu v. Terminix International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Neu
Represented By: Christopher Jay Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terminix International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Jay Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terminix International Company, LP
Represented By: Christopher Jay Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServiceMaster Company
Represented By: Christopher Jay Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServiceMaster Consumer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Jay Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServiceMaster Consumer Services Limited Partnership
Represented By: Christopher Jay Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?