Sprint Spectrum L.P. v. Sprint Spectrum Realty Company L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Sprint Spectrum Realty Company L.P.
Defendant: County of San Mateo, Board of Supervisors for the County of San Mateo, Mark Church, Jerry Hill, Rich Gordon, Rose Gibson and Adrienne Tissier
Case Number: 4:2008cv00342
Filed: January 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1934
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting (109 in case 4:08-cv-00342-CW and 62 Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-00056-CW ) Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PROPOSED INJUNCTION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting ( 94 in case 4:08-cv-00342-CW; 50 in case 4:11-cv-00056-CW ) Stipulation TO CONTINUE DATES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATES. Discovery due by 8/20/2012. Motions due by 10/8/2012. Responses due by 10/22/2012. Cross Motions due by 10/22/2012. Replies due by 11/5/2012. Replies due by 11/15/2012. Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/8/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 10/12/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting (38 in 4:11-cv-00056-CW) Stipulation to Continue Dates. Discovery due by 2/21/2012. Motions due by 4/2/2012. Opposition/Cross Motions due by 4/16/2012. Replies due by 4/30/2012. Replies due by 5/9/2012. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/12/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION, DOCKET NO. 83, AND SETTING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on August 3, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. This Order confirms that, as previously required, all parties, including the individual members of the Board of Supervisors for the County of San Mateo named as Defendants in this action, must personally attend the Settlement Conference before this Court on May 20, 2011. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/13/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Settlement Conference Reschduled for 5/20/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/21/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Conditional Order of Dimissal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 Granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/21/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 55 RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION. Cases C-08-0342 CW and C-09-5022 CW consolidated. FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION C-08-0342 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/28/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting re 53 Stipulation Continuing Briefing Dates, Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, And Date For Follow-Up CMC, filed by Rose Gibson, Board of Supervisors for the County of San Mateo, Adrienne Tissier, Mark Church, Rich Gordon, Jerry Hill, County of San Mateo Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Opening brief by Sprint due 10/30/09. Opposition / cross motions by County by 11/13/09. Reply/opposition by Sprint due 12/1/09. Reply by County by 12/10/09.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Continuing Briefing Dates, Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, And Date For Follow-up Case Management Conference re 48 Stipulation,, filed by Board of Supervisors for the County of San Mateo, Adrienne Tissier, Mark Church, Rich Gordon, County of San Mateo, Rose Gibson, Sprint Spectrum Realty Company L.P., Jerry Hill, Sprint Spectrum L.P. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2009 02:00 PM. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 46 granting Stipulation to Continue Briefing Dates, Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, and Date for Follow-Up Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re 43 granting Stipulation to Continue Briefing Dates. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/7/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING DATES, DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DATE, AND DATE FOR FOLLOW-UP CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/14/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Spectrum L.P. v. Sprint Spectrum Realty Company L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Represented By: John Joseph Flynn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Spectrum Realty Company L.P.
Represented By: John Joseph Flynn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors for the County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Tissier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?