Liebb v. Ayers
Petitioner: Stephen Liebb
Respondent: R. Ayers, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2008cv02643
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/13/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TENTATIVE RULING DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 11 Motion to Stay (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/8/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liebb v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Liebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Ayers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?