Curry v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Curry
Defendant: City of Oakland, Wayne Tucker, S. Barre and M. Valle
Case Number: 4:2008cv03695
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/1/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS IN.PDF FORMAT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2010. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2010 08:30 AM. Motions due by 5/25/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2010 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 11/12/2009 at 2:00 P.M., before the Honorable Joseph C. Spero, in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/19/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/9/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING re 40 Letter filed by Darrell Curry For Extension of Time To 10/8/9 to file settlement conference statements. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/14/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDERTO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference previously set for 9/10/9 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 10/15/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/14/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified on 5/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: That a Settlement Conference is set for 9/10/2009 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 3/5/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2009 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Curry
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Represented By: Arlene Marcia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Tucker
Represented By: Arlene Marcia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Barre
Represented By: Arlene Marcia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Valle
Represented By: Arlene Marcia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?