Pulis et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Peter Pulis, Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Giuseppe Fazio, Bruna Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane and Mara C. Fazio
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 4:2008cv04138
Filed: August 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #65 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified on 9/12/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2013 Filing 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Jennifer Cohn, Gregory Cohn, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Mara C. Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Bruna Fazio. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 9/9/2013) Modified on 9/10/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2013 ***See document #64 Set/Reset Hearing; Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2013 02:00 PM. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 63 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, August 28, 2013, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 62 Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified on 8/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2013 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 8/14/2013). Case Management Conferences set for 8/28/2013 02:00 PM and 9/11/2013 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, July 31, 2013, is continued to Wednesday, August 14, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by August 7, 2013. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 60 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference NOT held on 7/10/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/10/2013). Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Jennifer Macato.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 59 Joint Request to Continue CMC by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 7/10/2013) Modified on 7/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2013 Filing 58 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/5/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2013 Set Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2013 02:00 PM. See Docket No. #57 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re #56 Continuing Case Management Conference to July 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on April 30, 2013. (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane Notice of Settlement and Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2013) Modified on 4/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2013 Set Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2013 02:00 PM. See Order, Docket No. 54 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order granting #53 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. The CMC is continued to May 1, 2013. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 8, 2013 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Change to Date of Case Management Conference filed by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2013) Modified on 3/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #51 Stipulation Re Continuance of Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 14, 2013 Set Deadline/Hearing. See Docket No. 52. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 8, 2013 Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Giuseppe Fazio, Bruna Fazio, Francesca I. Fazio-O'Kane, Mara C. Fazio. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 1/8/2013) Modified on 1/9/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting #48 STIPULATION for Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/26/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012) Modified on 9/28/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #48 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012) Modified on 9/27/2012 (ndr, COURT STAFF).**Disregard, continuance date is incorrect. Please see docket no. 50 for the correct order.**
September 26, 2012 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2013 02:00 PM. See docket no. 49. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gregory Cohn, et al. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified on 9/26/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting #46 STIPULATION for Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/27/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Case Management Conference and Order Thereon filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Jennifer Cohn, Gregory Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Mara C. Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 3/26/2012) Modified on 3/27/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting #44 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Continuance of Case Management Conference and Order Thereon by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Giuseppe Fazio, Bruna Fazio, Francesa I. Fazio-O'Kane, Mara C. Fazio. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 11/8/2011) Modified on 11/9/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #42 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/16/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Continuance of Case Management Conference and (Proposed) Order Thereon by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Giuseppe Fazio, Bruna Fazio, Francesco I. Fazio-O'Kane, Mara C. Fazio. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/17/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #40 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/18/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 40 STIPULATION for Continuance of Case Management Conference and (Proposed) Order Thereon by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 38 STIPULATION for Continuance of Case Management Conference and (Proposed) Order Thereon by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #36 Granting Stipulation to continue re #34 Case Management Scheduling Order. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/25/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 36 STIPULATION to continue re #34 Case Management Scheduling Order; (Proposed) Order by Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Bruna Fazio, Giuseppe Fazio, Mara C. Fazio, Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 10/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE to Plaintiffs of Order Setting Case Management Conference by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 10/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/18/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/18/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010) Modified on 10/18/2010 (ndr, COURT STAFF). ** DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET 34 **
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/15/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/13/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The status/further case management conference set for 9/2/2010 is continued to 12/9/2010 at 3:30 PM, re doc #29 filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/30/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. The 9/2/2010 status conference is vacated. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference re-set for 12/9/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference and Order Thereon by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Goodman and Ann M. Blessing (Goodman, Robert) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting doc #25 Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. The case management conference set for 4/1/2010 shall be continued to 9/2/2010 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/30/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated as to 4/1 cmc. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 26 Proposed Order re #25 Joint Case Management Statement (Proposed) Order Continuing Joint Case Management Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 25 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and REQUEST For Continuance of Case Management Conference to Date On Or After August 19, 2010 filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 3/26/2010) Modified on 3/30/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2009 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/1/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker ; further case management conference scheduled for 4/1/2010 at 3:30 PM. (Court Reporter not reported.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2009)
October 1, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
August 17, 2009 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE continuing the case management conference from 8/20/2009 to 10/1/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2009 03:30 PM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 Filing 21 Statement Joint Statement Following Mediation; Request for Continuance of August 20, 2009 Conference by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE continuing the further case management conference. Further Case Management Conference continued from 6/25/2009 to 8/20/2009 03:30 PM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY re doc #17 filed by Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Giuseppe Fazio, Jennifer Cohn, Gregory Cohn, Mara C. Fazio, Bruna Fazio, Peter Pulis. Plaintiff Peter E Pulis is no longer a party to this action by reason of transfer of interest to the remaining and existing plaintiffs in the case. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/28/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Sonja A. Inglin Regarding Amount in Controversy by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 17 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Substituting Party by Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Mara C. Fazio, Peter Pulis, Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Giuseppe Fazio, Bruna Fazio. (Finkelstein, David) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
February 20, 2009 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Corrected Case Management Statement filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 15 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/29/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Attorneys : For Plaintiff(s): David Finkelstein, Kamin Kamali. For Defendant(s): Sonja Inglin. ADR to be used: Parties agreed to Private Mediation. Completion date: 6/1/2009. Further Case Management Conference : 6/25/2009 at 3:30 P.M. (Court Reporter not reported.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2009 03:30 PM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 22, 2009 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Inglin, Sonja) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 14, 2009 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Francesca Fazio-O'Kane, Mara C. Fazio, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Peter Pulis, Gregory Cohn, Jennifer Cohn, Giuseppe Fazio, Bruna Fazio (Finkelstein, David) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 10 ADR Clerk's Notice Re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ls7, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
October 15, 2008 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE on case reassignment : Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2009 03:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2008: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order) (cgk, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/08. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Cannon, Jamaul) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 3, 2008 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2010: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2008 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2008 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008) (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2008. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2008 at 4:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
August 29, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 474325. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611022928). Filed byGoodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2010: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cp, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulis et al v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Pulis
Represented By: David G. Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Cohn
Represented By: David G. Finkelstein
Represented By: Ann M. Blessing
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cohn
Represented By: David G. Finkelstein
Represented By: Ann M. Blessing
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppe Fazio
Represented By: David G. Finkelstein
Represented By: Ann M. Blessing
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruna Fazio
Represented By: David G. Finkelstein
Represented By: Ann M. Blessing
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca Fazio-O'Kane
Represented By: David G. Finkelstein
Represented By: Ann M. Blessing
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mara C. Fazio
Represented By: David G. Finkelstein
Represented By: Ann M. Blessing
Represented By: Robert C. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Sonja Ann Inglin
Represented By: Jamaul Dimitri Cannon
Represented By: John Frank Cermak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?