Banga v. Experian Information Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions and Kohls
Case Number: 4:2008cv04147
Filed: March 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER Granting re 335 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Kohls. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/17/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 329 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 292 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 247 Motion for Summary Judgment ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/19/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Application to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 248 Motion to Seal Documents (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER REGARDING EXPERIAN'S EVDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF KAMLESH BANGA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009) Modified on 1/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 198 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's Opposition shall be REMOVED from the docket. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 238 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER RE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. The following cases are not related: Cases C 05-4417 MMC Banga v. Experian Information Solutions, and C 08-4147 SBA Banga v. Experian Information Solutions, et al. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/29/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING Motion to Seal Exhibits A, B, and C to the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/27/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: Directing Plaintiff to submit Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/20/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Arsmtrong GRANTING 146 Motion to Seal Document (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009) Modified on 8/20/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen DENYING 100 , 105 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Experian for Destruction of Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009) Modified on 8/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Arsmtrong GRANTING 94 Motion to Withdraw Claim for Emotional Distress Damages; DENYING AS MOOT 94 Motion to Quash Subpoena for the Deposition of Madan Lal; DENYING AS MOOT 113 Amended Motion to Partial Withdrawal of Claim Against Chase (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER re Deposition of Madan Lal. Plaintiff to file/serve a statement as to withdrawal of claims within one-week from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen, on 7/8/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009) Modified on 7/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re 100 Plaintiff's Letter of June 18, 2009. A motion hearing shall be held on 07/29/09 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009) Modified on 6/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 43 Defendant's Motion to Compel; and Deferring Ruling on 44 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED ORDER re 90 Order on Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009) Modified on 6/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen, on 5/27/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009) Modified on 5/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER for Limited Purposes of Plaintiff's Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009) Modified on 5/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re Plaintiff's Deposition; RECOMMENDATION re Discovery Deadline 47 , 58 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009) Modified on 5/14/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.'s Request for Appearance at ADR Early Neutral Evaluation by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 2/26/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Experian Information Solutions Inc.'s Request to Appear at the Early Neutral Evaluation by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 3/10/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/01/09 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/24/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009) Modified on 2/25/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/19/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banga v. Experian Information Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions
Represented By: Eric John Hardeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls
Represented By: Gregory P. Dresser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?