Cotton et al v. City of Eureka, California et al
Plaintiff: Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton and Cotton
Defendant: HCCF Officer Cangas, HCCF Officer Christensen, City of Eureka, California, County of Humboldt, California, Brian Franco, Corporal Griffin, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, HCCF Officer Morgan, Rossiter, Josh Siipola, HCCF Officer Strong, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer and Justin Winkle
Case Number: 4:2008cv04386
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Filing 343 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Exhibits disposed in accordance with Civil Local Rule 79-4(c). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 342 CLERK'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LODGED VIDEO RECORDING. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 2, 2013 Filing 341 CLERKS NOTICE of Disposal of Defendants' Trial Exhibits in accordance with Local Rule 79-4(c). (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 340 Acknowledgement of Receipt of Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 339 NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW TRIAL EXHIBITS, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Modified on 3/6/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice as to Justin Winkle, Adam Laird, City of Eureka, California and Gary E. Whitmer re #337 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/10/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2013 Filing 337 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 1/10/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2012 Filing 336 NOTICE OF RELEASE OF LIEN, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 12/7/2012) Modified on 12/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 AMENDED ORDER re #333 Order on Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/5/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) Modified on 12/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2012 Filing 334 CLERKS NOTICE to Counsel for Withdrawal of Exhibits in Accordance with Local Rule 79-4(b) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #327 Motion to Vacate; GRANTING #331 Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise Settlement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/30/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012) Modified on 12/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 Filing 332 MANDATE of USCA: That the appeal is dismissed without prejudice to reinstatement in the event the district court denies petition for approval of minor's compromise of Siehna Cotton, as to #297 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 12-15666. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 331 MOTION APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SIEHNA M. COTTON'S COMPROMISE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DALE K. GALIPO filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/8/2012. Replies due by 11/15/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/25/2012) Modified on 10/26/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 Filing 330 Proposed Order re #327 Joint MOTION to Vacate Judgment by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 329 Request for Judicial Notice re #327 Joint MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed byCity of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Related document(s) #327 ) (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 328 Declaration of Nicholas R. Kloeppel in Support of #327 Joint MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed byCity of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Related document(s) #327 ) (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 327 Joint MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/8/2012. Replies due by 11/15/2012. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 326 STIPULATION for Payment of Attorneys Fees & Costs Pursuant to Approved Minor's Compromise, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Rossiter, Strong, Siehna M. Cotton. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG adopting Report and Recommendations as to #319 Report and Recommendations.; terminating #251 Motion for Attorney Fees (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #323 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/21/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 Filing 323 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #284 Ex Parte Motoin for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff. Objections due by 8/24/2012. Signed by Judge Beeler on 08/12/2012. (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012) Modified on 8/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 Filing 322 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2012 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 8/10/2012) re #284 Ex Parte Application Request for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff. (Court Reporter Debra Pas) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/10/2012) Modified on 8/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING COUNTY DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR COURT DIRECTION AND/OR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT DISPUTED ATTORNEYS FEES FOR THE PLAINTIFF Motion Hearing for 8/10/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 321 Memorandum in Opposition re #320 Objection to Report and Recommendation by the Magistrate Judge Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING COUNTY DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR COURT DIRECTION AND/OR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT DISPUTED ATTORNEYS FEES FOR THE PLAINTIFF Motion Hearing for 8/10/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 23, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING COUNTY DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR COURT DIRECTION AND/OR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT DISPUTED ATTORNEYS FEES FOR THE PLAINTIFF Motion Hearing for 8/2/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. If the hearing date is inconvenient for counsel, please contact the courtroom deptuy, Lashanda Scott at 415-522-3140 to arrange a new hearing date. The court can specially set the hearing based on counsel's schedule. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012) Modified on 7/25/2012 (ls, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2012 Filing 320 OBJECTIONS to #319 Report and Recommendations re Motion for Attorneys Fees, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 7/19/2012) Modified on 7/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2012 Filing 319 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #251 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton Objections due by 7/19/2012. Signed by Judge Beeler on 07/05/2012. (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 28, 2012 Filing 318 Minute Entry: Plaintiff's Motions for Attorney Fees Hearing held on 6/28/2012 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 6/28/2012). (Court Reporter Debra Pas) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/28/2012)
June 26, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees set for 6/28/2012 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Plaintiff's counsel shall set up the conference call and provide the courtroom deputy, Lashanda Scott with the dial-in conference information. The conference call information shall be provided to the clerk no later than Wednesday, June 27th by 3:00 p.m. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry). (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) Modified on 6/26/2012 (ls, COURT STAFF).(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 ***DISREGARD ENTRY***ENTERED IN ERROR** CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing on Defendants' Request for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees set for 6/28/2012 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Defendant's counsel shall set up the conference call and provide the courtroom deputy, Lashanda Scott with the dial-in conference information. The conference call information shall be provided to the clerk no later than Wednesday, June 27th by 3:00 p.m. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry). (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) Modified on 6/26/2012 (ls, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2012 Filing 317 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 23, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 316 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 22, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 315 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 21, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 314 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 16, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 313 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 15, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 312 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 14, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 311 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 12, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 310 Transcript of Proceedings held on Tuesday, September 6, 2011, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER of USCA: That Court Reporter Diane Skillman's motion for extension of time to file transcript is granted. Transcript is now due 06/15/12. as to #297 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 12-15666 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 308 Supplemental Declaration of Brian E. Claypool in Support of #292 Declaration of Kimberly Starr filed by Brian E Claypool. (Related document(s) #292 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 307 Supplemental Declaration of Brian E. Claypool in Response to #292 Declaration of Kimberly Starr filed by Brian E Claypool. (Related document(s) #292 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 306 OBJECTIONS to #292 Declaration of Kimberly Starr in Support, filed by Brian E Claypool. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 305 Supplemental Declaration of Brian E. Claypool in Response to #293 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento, filed by Brian E Claypool. (Related document(s) #293 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 304 Supplemental Declaration of Brian E. Claypool in Response to #292 Declaration of Kimberly Starr, filed by Brian E Claypool. (Related document(s) #292 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2012 Filing 303 OBJECTIONS to #292 Declaration of Kimberly Starr in Support, filed by Brian E Claypool. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 25, 2012 Filing 302 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 12/14/10, 09/06/11, 09/12/11, 09/14/11, 09/15/11, 09/16/11, 09/21/11, 09/22/11, 09/23/11 before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong, re #297 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 5/29/2012. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 301 SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL re #296 Order, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle (Receipt no. 44611008686). (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER REFERRING MOTION re #284 Ex Parte Motion for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff, #288 Ex Parte Motion for Settlement Funds to be Paid into Escrow or Interpleader Account. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/28/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) Modified on 3/30/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/30/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2012 Filing 299 USCA Case Number 12-15666 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #297 Notice of Appeal, filed by City of Eureka, California. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 298 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-6695208 by City of Eureka, California. (Nicholson, Suzanne) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 297 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA City of Eureka, California.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-6695292 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Nicholson, Suzanne) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #256 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; DENYING #256 Motion for New Trial; DENYING #261 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/16/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Modified on 3/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO #296 *** ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying #256 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #256 Motion for New Trial; denying #261 Motion to Stay. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Modified on 3/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2012 Filing 294 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton re #291 Declaration in Support, #292 Declaration in Support, #290 Declaration in Support, #293 Declaration in Support, (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 2/15/2012) Modified on 2/16/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 293 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Response to Declaration of Brian E. Claypool, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s)) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 292 Declaration of Kimberly Starr in Response to Declaration of Brian E. Claypool, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s)) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 291 Declaration of Martin Cotton, Sr. in Response to Declaration of Brian E. Claypool, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s)) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 290 Declaration of Dale K. Galipo in Response to #286 Ex Parte Motion for Direction/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #286 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #256 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, or in the alternative, MOTION for New Trial. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. THIS IS TEXT ONLY ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 7, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #261 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2012 10:00 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 7, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #261 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #251 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/1/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012) Modified on 2/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Report and Recommendation (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 31, 2012 Filing 288 Ex Parte MOTION for Settlement Funds to be Paid into Escrow or Interpleader Account, filed by Brian E Claypool. (Goostrey, Stephen) (Filed on 1/31/2012) Modified on 2/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2012 Filing 287 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #286 Response, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 1/30/2012) Modified on 1/31/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2012 Filing 286 RESPONSE to #284 Ex Parte Motion for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan McClure)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 1/30/2012) Modified on 1/31/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2012 Filing 285 Declaration of William R. Bragg in Support of #284 Ex Parte Motion for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rossiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #284 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2012 Filing 284 Ex Parte MOTION for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rossiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2012 Filing 283 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE #280 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER: That Settlement against Defendants County of Humboldt, et al, in the sum of $60,000 is approved. Attorney's Fees and Costs in the amount of $26,856.56 to Law Offices of Vicki I. Sarmiento, and approving $33,143.44 to be distributed to minor through structured settlement, re #279 Order on Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/23/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2012 Filing 281 Declaration of William R. Bragg in Support of #280 Notice of Request for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rossiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #280 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2012 Filing 280 NOTICE of Request for Court Direction and/or Leave to Deposit Disputed Attorney's Fees for the Plaintiff, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rossiter, Strong (Bragg, William) (Filed on 1/24/2012) Modified on 1/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #277 Ex Parte Motion for Order Approving Minor's Compromise and Disbursing Fund. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/23/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2012 Filing 278 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #277 Ex Parte Motion for Order Approving Minor's Compromise and Disbursing Funds; Megan McClure's Petition to Approve Compromise of Minor Siehna M. Cotton; Memorandum of Law; Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento with Proof of Ex Parte Notice; Proposed Order, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 1/9/2012) Modified on 1/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2012 Filing 277 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Approving Minor's Compromise and Disbursing Funds; Megan McClure's Petition to Approve Compromise of Minor Siehna M. Cotton; Memorandum of Law; Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento with Proof of Ex Parte Notice filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 1/9/2012) Modified on 1/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2012 Filing 276 Supplemental Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of #251 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 1/5/2012) Modified on 1/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2012 Filing 275 Supplemental Declaration of John C. Fattahi in Support of #251 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #251 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 1/5/2012) Modified on 1/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2011 Filing 274 STIPULATION re Martin Cotton, Sr. for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of County of Humboldt, HCCF Corporal Griffin, HCCF Officers Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rossiter and Strong, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rossiter, Strong, Martin Cotton, Sr.. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2011 Filing 273 STIPULATION re Martin Cotton, Sr. for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of County of Humboldt, HCCF Corporal Griffin, HCCF Officers Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rossiter and Strong, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rossiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 Filing 272 Reply Memorandum re #261 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec'l of Byrne Conley in Support of Reply to Opposition, #2 Declaration Dec'l of Mark Ferguson in Support of Reply to Opposition, #3 Proof of Service)(Nicholson, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2011 Filing 271 Costs Taxed in amount of $15,038.70 against Defendant City of Eureka. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 270 Memorandum in Opposition to #261 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgement and Request for Temporary Stay in the Interim, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 11/16/2011) Modified on 11/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT. as to #261 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment and #262 Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011) Modified on 11/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2011 Filing 268 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Temporary Stay of Enforcement of Judgment Pending Disposition of Defendants' Post-Trial Motions, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton. (Nicholson, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/15/2011) Modified on 11/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 Filing 267 Supplemental Declaration of Nicholas R. Kloeppel in Support of #256 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 Filing 266 Reply to Opposition re #256 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 Filing 265 Memorandum in Opposition re #262 Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 11/7/2011) Modified on 11/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2011 Filing 264 Memorandum in Opposition re #256 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 11/4/2011) Modified on 11/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2011 Filing 263 CLERKS NOTICE: That the hearing has been continued as to #261 Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment, #256 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 Filing 262 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment, filed by City of Eureka, California, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Adam Laird. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec'l of S. Nicholson, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nicholson, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 Filing 261 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment, filed by Gary E. Whitmer, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/16/2011. Replies due by 11/23/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec'l of D. Clovis, #2 Declaration Dec'l of D. Tyson, #3 Declaration Dec'l of M. Ferguson, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nicholson, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 Filing 260 Reply to Opposition re #251 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento, #2 Declaration of Dale K. Galipo)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 11/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 259 OBJECTIONS to #252 Declarations of Milton C. Grimes, Paul L. Hoffman, John Burton and Danilo Becerra Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/21/2011) Modified on 10/24/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 258 Memorandum in Opposition re #251 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/21/2011) Modified on 10/24/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 257 Declaration of Nicholas R. Kloeppel in Support of #256 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Related document(s) #256 ) (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/21/2011) Modified on 10/24/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/24/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 256 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, or in the alternative,, MOTION for New Trial filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/4/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 255 Declaration of Nicholas R. Kloeppel in Support of #254 Objection filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/20/2011) Modified on 10/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2011 Filing 254 OBJECTIONS to #249 Bill of Costs, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/20/2011) Modified on 10/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2011 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance of Suzanne Michelle Nicholson as Counsel, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle (Nicholson, Suzanne) (Filed on 10/19/2011) Modified on 10/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 Filing 252 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of #251 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dale K. Galipo, #2 Declaration John C. Fattahi, #3 Declaration Melanie T. Partow, #4 Declaration Milton C. Grimes, #5 Declaration Paul Hoffman, #6 Declaration John Burton, #7 Declaration Danilo Becerra)(Related document(s) #251 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 Filing 251 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #249 Bill of Costs by Vicki Ingrid Sarmiento on behalf of Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 249 BILL OF COSTS by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to F to Bill of Costs)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 248 Exhibit List, filed by Christensen, City of Eureka, California, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Morgan, Rossiter, Strong, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 247 Exhibit List, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton.. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 246 FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiffs, Siehna M. Cotton, by Megan McClure, her guardian ad litem and Martin Cotton, Sr., entered in the amounts of $4,000,000 against Defendants City of Eureka, Adam Laird, Justin Winkle and Gary Whitmer in favor of Plaintiff Siehna M. Cotton; $500,000 against Defendants City of Eureka, Adam Laird, Justin Winkle and Gary Whitmer in favor of Plaintiff Martin Cotton, Sr.; $30,000 against Adam Laird in favor of Plaintiffs Siehna M. Cotton and Martin Cotton, Sr.; $30,000 against Justin Winkle in favor of Plaintiffs Siehna M. Cotton and Martin Cotton, Sr.; $15,000 against Gary Whitmer in favor of Plaintiffs Siehna M. Cotton and Martin Cotton, Sr. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/23/11. ***Civil Case Terminated. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2011 Filing 245 JURY VERDICT. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER AND JURY INSTRUCTIONS Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 09/22/2011. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 243 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 9/23/2011 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 9/23/2011). (Court Reporter DIANE SKILLMAN.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 242 Trial Sheet: Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) Exhibit and Witness List. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/22/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Exhibit Location D-4: Plaintiffs' Exhibits: 2(b), 2(c), 3(e), 3(e)(i), 3(L), 3(R), 3(T), 5, 19, 21, 23, 24, 26, 50(b), 50(c), 50(d), 50(g), 50(p), 50(q), and 132-4; Defendants' Exhibits: B-26, B-27, C, D, N and X. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2011 Exhibit Location: Chart 9: Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 3(O), 3(S) and 3(U); Defendants' Trial Exhibits A and B-1. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 240 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/22/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 9/22/2011). (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/26/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2011 Filing 239 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/21/2011 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 9/21/2011). (Court Reporter DIANE SKILLMAN.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 238 Proposed Form of Verdict by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 237 Proposed Jury Instructions by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle (Proposed Supplemental Instruction). (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 236 Proposed Form of Verdict by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 235 Exhibit List (Amended) by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle.. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 234 Proposed Jury Instructions by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton Plaintiffs' Second Amended Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 233 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on September 19, 2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 9/20/2011). Case did not settle. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 232 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/16/2011 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 9/16/2011). (Court Reporter DIANE SKILLMAN.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong VACATING HEARING re #226 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/16/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011) Modified on 9/19/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2011 Filing 230 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 229 CLERKS NOTICE: Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 228 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 9/20/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/19/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2011 Filing 227 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/15/2011 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 9/15/2011). (Court Reporter DIANE SKILLMAN.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement on 9/20/11. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 225 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 9/14/2011 before JUDGE ARMSTRONG (Date Filed: 9/14/2011). (Court Reporter DIANE SKILLMAN.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 224 Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions (Amended ), filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Galipo, Dale) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2011 Filing 223 Proposed Order to Allow Audio Equipment in Courtroom 1 by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 222 Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton. (Galipo, Dale) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2011 Filing 221 Amended Proposed Jury Instructions, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 219 Proposed Order To Allow Audio Visual Equipment In Courtroom 1 by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 218 Minute Entry: Jury Selection held on 9/12/2011 before Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 9/12/2011), Jury Trial began on 9/12/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 9/12/2011). (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2011) Modified on 9/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER RE FAILURE TO TRAIN CLAIM. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 11, 2011 Filing 216 Amended Exhibit List, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/11/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2011 Filing 215 Brief re Opinions of Roger Clark on Defendant City's Inadequate Training, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Galipo, Dale) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2011 Filing 214 TRIAL BRIEF: Regarding Training Issue Relative to Seeking Medical Care for Arrestees, filed by City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2011 Filing 213 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rossiter (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge 9/7/11 on 9/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER re Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 210 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 209 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference Held on 09/06/2011 (Date Filed: 9/6/2011). Jury Trial Continued to 09/12/11 at 8:30 AM (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #167 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #178 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/31/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2011 Filing 207 CLERKS NOTICE Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #204 Motion for Relief From Personal Appearance. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/16/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 Filing 205 Proposed Order re #204 Motion for Relief from Personal Attendance of Named Correctional Officers at Pretrial Conference, by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/15/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 Filing 204 MOTION for Relief from Personal Attendance of Named Correctional Officers at Pretrial Conference filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/15/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING RE #178 Motion for Summary Judgment, #167 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/4/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2011 Filing 202 OBJECTIONS to #198 Declaration of Dale J. Walker in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment, #199 Supplemental Declaration of Adam Laird in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 4/5/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated re Reply Deadline as to #162 Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 201 Reply Memorandum re #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment, filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 200 Supplemental Declaration of Nancy K. Delaney in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment, filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 199 Supplemental Declaration of Adam Laird in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment, filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 198 Declaration of Dale J. Walker in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 197 Declaration of Adam Laird in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 196 OBJECTIONS to re #188 Declaration of Roger Clark in Support, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 195 Declaration of William R. Bragg in Support of #194 Motion for Sumary Judgment filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #194 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 194 Reply to Opposition re #167 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2011 Filing 193 EXHIBITS: Videorecording of Decedent, Martin Cotton at HCCF re #187 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #187 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 192 NOTICE of Manual Filing re Videorecording re #189 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2011 Filing 191 EXHIBITS L-P to #189 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #189 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4)
March 22, 2011 Filing 190 EXHIBITS H-K re #189 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #189 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2011 Filing 189 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of #187 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Related document(s) #187 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 Filing 188 Declaration of Expert Witness Roger Clark in Support of #187 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #187 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated re Response Deadline as to #162 Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 187 Memorandum in Opposition re #167 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 Filing 186 Declaration of Expert Witness Roger A. Clark in Support of #184 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Related document(s) #184 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 Filing 185 Declaration of Dale K. Galipo in Support of #184 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-8)(Related document(s) #184 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 Filing 184 Memorandum in Opposition re #178 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 183 Proposed Order re #178 Granting Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 182 Declaration of Adam Laird in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment, filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 181 Declaration of Stephen Watson in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 180 Declaration of Tim Jones in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 179 Declaration of Nancy K. Delaney in Support of #178 Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, filed by City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 177 Proposed Order re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 176 Declaration of William R. Bragg in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 175 Declaration of Duane Christian in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 174 Declaration of Devin Strong in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 173 Declaration of Frances Morgan in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 172 Declaration of Dennis Edward Griffin in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 171 Declaration of Fernando Cangas in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 170 Declaration of Chet Christensen in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 169 Declaration of Adam Rossiter in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 168 Declaration of Leland Meyers in Support of #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #167 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: That Defendant Brian Franco is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/24/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011) Modified on 2/25/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE of Certification re Dismissal of Certain Individual Defendants, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 2/22/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2011 Filing 164 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Defendant Brian Franco by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 163 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Brian Franco with Proposed Order, filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 2/22/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion due by 3/7/11. Responses due by 3/21/2011. Replies due by 3/28/2011. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/10/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/10/2011 (lrc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/12/2011 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/10/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Jury Selection set for 9/12/2011 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 160 Letter re Trial Availability of Counsel for County of Humboldt, from Paula Lourenzo, dated 07/27/11. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 2/7/2011) Modified on 2/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2011 Filing 159 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held, case did not settle. (Date Filed: 2/1/2011). (Recording: Not Recorded.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/1/2011) Modified on 2/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #155 Motion for Relief from Personal Attendance of Named Correctional Officers at Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 01/31/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 Filing 157 Proposed Order re #155 Motion for Relief from personal attendance of named correctional officers at pretrial conference by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/26/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING #154 Motion for Relief of Party Attendance at Settlement Conference. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2010 Filing 155 MOTION from personal attendance of named correctional officers at pretrial conference filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 154 MOTION for Relief of Party Attendance at Settlement Conference filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/30/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2010 Filing 153 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE #151 & #152 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 152 Letter from William R. Bragg in Pleading Form Request for Relief from Personal Attendance of Named Correctional Officers at Pretrial Conference. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 151 Letter from William R. Bragg in Pleading Form Application for Relief of Party Attendance at Settlement Conference. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge: Settlement Conference set for 2/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/21/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 15, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: re #149 Settlement Conference set for 2/18/2011 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Settlement (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for a MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to take place on 02/18/11 at 9:00 AM. Settlement Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2011 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/15/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010) Modified on 12/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 Filing 148 Minute Entry: Interim Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 12/14/2010). Case referred to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Settlement Conference (Court Reporter: Leo Mankiewicz.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2010) Modified on 12/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Pretrial Conference as to #139 Case Management Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #121 Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #123 Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #127 Motion in Limine. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2010 Filing 146 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Jury Instructions by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 9, 2010 Filing 145 OBJECTIONS to #93 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 12/9/2010) Modified on 12/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2010 Filing 144 OBJECTIONS to re #99 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 12/9/2010) Modified on 12/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #136 Motion to Appoint Megan McClure as Guardian ad Litem for Plaintiff Siehna M. Cotton, in place of Fungula Fumu Ngondji. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) Modified on 12/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: That Defendant Joshua Siipola is dismissed with prejudice. Parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Josh Siipola terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/1/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010) Modified on 10/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2010 Filing 141 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Defendant Joshua Siipola, by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/29/2010) Modified on 9/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2010 Filing 140 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Joshua Siipola, filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/29/2010) Modified on 9/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/10/2011 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2010 01:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 1/10/2011 08:30AM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 138 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2010 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong's Law Clerk. Pretrial Conference Continued to 12/14/10 at 1:00 PM; Jury Trial Continued to 01/10/11 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 9/23/2010). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Filing 137 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT RE: PROPOSED TRIAL DATE filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton, City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 Filing 136 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2010 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/20/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 134 Reply to Opposition to #131 City Defendants' Motions in Limine filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/17/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 Filing 133 Defendants' Reply Brief filed in Support of #109 , #123 Motions in Limine filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/17/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 132 Declaration of Dale K. Galipo in Support of #131 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #131 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 131 Memorandum in Opposition re #127 Motion in Limine filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 130 Reply to Opposition re #121 Motion in Limine filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dale K. Galipo and Exhibit A)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 129 Memorandum in Opposition re #123 Motion in Limine filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to #123 Motion in Limine, #121 Motion. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 128 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed byCity of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 127 MOTION in Limine of Defendants City of Eureka, Justin Winkle, Adam Laird, Gary Whitmer, Steven Watson, Tim Jones, Josh Siipola and Brian Franco filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 126 Joinder in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 125 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Jury Instructions by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 124 Declaration of Andrew Stunich in Support of #123 Motion in Limine re Meet and Confer to Discuss Motions in Limine filed byCangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #123 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Filing 123 MOTION in Limine filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: re #122 Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong STRIKING #110 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #111 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #112 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #113 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #114 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #115 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #116 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #117 Motion in Limine; STRIKING #120 Motion in Limine. Defendants may re-file their motions in limine by 09/07/10; Plaintiffs' opposition due 09/14/10; replies due 09/17/10. The Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 09/28/10 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 09/02/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 121 MOTION in Limine Numbers 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 and 7 filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Galipo, Dale) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 120 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine of defendants City of Eureka, Justin Winkle, Adam Laird, Gary Whitmer, Steven Watson, Tim Jones, Josh Siipola and Brian Franco filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 119 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Exhibits by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 118 Declaration of Andrew J. Stunich in Support of #109 , #110 , #111 , #112 , #113 , #114 , #115 , #116 & #117 Motions in Limine filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 117 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Argument or Evidence that the Subdural Hematoma was caused by the County Defendants filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 116 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony by Karen Lovie and to Exclude Exhibit 118 - Karen Lovie Interview CD, any transcripts thereof, e-mails from Karen Lovie, and any Reports drafted by Karen Lovie filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 115 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Martin F. Cotton, Sr. filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 114 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions by Roger Clark - Request for Evidentiary Hearing Pursuant to FRE 104(A) filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 113 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Photographs of Decedent filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 112 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Autopsy Photographs of Decedent filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 111 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Exclude Exhibits 91-100 re: Sheriff Incident Reports filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 110 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #122 *** MOTION in Limine to Exclude Exhibits 133-144 re: Witness Interviews filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 109 JOINDER to Motions in Limine, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/31/2010) Modified on 9/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2010 Filing 108 Proposed Jury Instructions by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton Amended. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 107 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #108 *** Proposed Jury Instructions by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/31/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 Filing 106 Proposed Joint Jury Instructions, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton, City of Eureka, California, County of Humboldt, California. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 105 Exhibit List, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton.. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 104 Witness List, filed by Siehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr.. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 103 Proposed Form of Verdict by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 102 Proposed Voir Dire, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 101 Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton, filed by City of Eureka, California, County of Humboldt, California. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 100 TRIAL BRIEF by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 99 Proposed Jury Instructions by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle (Special Instructions). (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 98 Exhibit List by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle.. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 97 Witness List by Justin Winkle, Tim Jones, Steven Watson, City of Eureka, California, Adam Laird, Brian Franco, Josh Siipola, Gary E. Whitmer. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 96 Proposed Form of Verdict by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 95 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #106 *** Proposed Jury Instructions by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 94 Witness and Exhibit List, filed by Strong, Cangas, Rissiter, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 93 Proposed Jury Instructions by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 92 Proposed Voir Dire by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 91 TRIAL BRIEF, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 90 TRIAL BRIEF, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2010 Filing 89 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference. Did not settle (Date Filed: 8/23/2010). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2010) Modified on 8/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference reset for 8/23/2010 10:30 AM. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
July 28, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 8/23/2010 10:00 AM. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 8/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 205A, 2nd Floor, Eureka. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Motions Deadline as to #44 Case Management Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 88 Letter to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas re new settlement conference hearing date of 08/23/10, from Vicki I. Sarmiento, dated 07/27/10. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 7/27/2010) Modified on 7/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #46 Motion for Sanctions (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2010 Filing 86 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 7/20/2010 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Defendants' Motion for Sanctions or, in the alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege #46 . (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to #46 Motion for Sanctions or, in the alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #84 Motion to Appear by Telephone (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 19, 2010 Filing 84 MOTION to Appear by Telephone to Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions for Discovery Abuses by Counsel, scheduled for July 20, 2010 at 9:00 am filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 83 Declaration of Nancy K. Delaney in Support of #82 Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions for Discovery Abuses by Plaintiffs' Counsel or, in the Alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Filing 82 Reply to Opposition re #46 Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions for Discovery Abuses by Plaintiffs' Counsel or, In the Alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 Filing 81 Supplemental Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of #78 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMartin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified on 7/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #66 Ex Parte Motion Extending Time to Hear Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING AS MOOT #67 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010) Modified on 7/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2010 Filing 79 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of #78 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2010 Filing 78 Memorandum in Opposition re #46 Motion for Sanctions or, in the alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2010 Filing 77 Memorandum in Opposition re #66 Ex Parte Motion Shortening Time to Hear Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment and Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/22/2010) Modified on 6/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 76 Proposed Order re #67 Memorandum in Support and Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 75 Declaration of William R. Bragg in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Bragg Dec)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 74 Declaration of Duane Christian in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Christian Dec, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Christian Dec, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Christian Dec)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 73 Declaration of Devin Strong in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 72 Declaration of Adam Rossiter in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Rossiter Dec, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Rossiter Dec, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Rossiter Dec, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Rossiter Dec, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Rossiter Dec)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 71 Declaration of Frances Morgan in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Frances Morgan Declaration)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 70 Declaration of Dennis Edward Griffin in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Griffin Declaration)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 69 Declaration of Chet Christensen in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Chet Christensen Declaration)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 68 Declaration of Fernando Cangas in Support of #67 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cangas Dec)(Related document(s) #67 ) (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 67 Memorandum in Support and MOTION for Summary Judgment/Adjudication, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 66 Ex Parte MOTION and Proposed Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion for Summary Judgment/Partial Summary Judgment and Declaration of Andrew J. Stunich filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010) Modified on 6/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2010 Filing 64 Declaration of Brian E. Claypool in Support of #62 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMartin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Related document(s) #62 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 63 Declaration of Vicki I. Sarmiento in Support of #62 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMartin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #62 ) (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 62 Memorandum in Opposition re #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton. (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/9/2010) Modified on 6/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2010 Filing 61 Joinder #58 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 Filing 60 Proposed Order re #58 Granting An Extension of Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 Filing 59 Declaration of Nicholas R. Kloeppel in Support of #58 Motion to Extend Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2010 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Non-Expert Discovery Cut-off), filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Kloeppel, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/3/2010) Modified on 6/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES AND SETTING Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions or, in the alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege #46 . Hearing set for 7/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/1/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 28, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the discovery cut-off for Plaintiff's Experts has been EXTENDED to 06/21/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) Modified on 5/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #46 Motion for Sanctions or, in the alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) Modified on 5/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2010 Filing 54 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Expert Discovery Cut-Off, filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 5/25/2010) Modified on 5/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2010 Filing 53 JOINDER re #46 Motion for Sanctions filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 5/24/2010) Modified on 5/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2010 Filing 52 CLERKS NOTICE: Continuing Motion Hearing to 7/21/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010) Modified on 5/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 51 Declaration of Richard Bradley in Support of #46 Motion for Sanctions for Discovery Abuses by Plaintiffs' Counsel or, in the Alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 50 Declaration of Andrew Stunich in Support of #46 Motion for Sanctions for Discovery Abuses by Plaintiffs' Counsel or, in the Alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 49 Declaration of Nicholas R. Kloeppel in Support of #46 Motion for Sanctions for Discovery Abuses by Plaintiffs' Counsel or, in the Alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 48 Declaration of Nancy K. Delaney in Support of #46 Motion for Sanctions for Discovery Abuses by Plaintiffs' Counsel or, in the Alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 47 Request for Judicial Notice re #46 Motion for Sanctions or, in the Alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 46 MOTION for Sanctions or, in the alternative, for Instruction Regarding Witness's Invocation of Fifth Amendment Privilege Against Self-Incrimination at Deposition, filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Discovery Deadline as to #44 Case Management Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE Settlement Conference reset for 8/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 205A, 2nd Floor, Eureka. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/12/2010. Jury Trial set for 10/4/2010 08:30 AM. Motions due by 7/27/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2010 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Filing 43 Proposed Order re #42 Granting Joint Stipulation to Modify Existing Scheduling Order by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Filing 42 STIPULATION to Modify Existing Scheduling Order, filed by City of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle, Siehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr.. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 1/21/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: re #41 Settlement Conference set for 4/19/2010 at 10:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas GRANTING #40 Stipulation to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 4/19/2010 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas, on 11/4/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009) Modified on 11/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2009 Filing 40 STIPULATION to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, filed by Cangas, Christensen, Brian Franco, Corporal Griffin, Adam Laird, Morgan, Rissiter, Josh Siipola, Strong, Steven Watson, Justin Winkle, Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton, City of Eureka, . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/29/2009) Modified on 10/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/15/2010. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2010 08:30 AM. Motions due by 4/20/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2010 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/19/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 38 JOINT STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Modify Extisting Scheduling Order by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton, Corporal Griffin, Adam Laird, Morgan, Rissiter, Josh Siipola, Strong, Steven Watson, Justin Wikle, Cangas, Christensen, City of Eureka, California, County of Humboldt, Brian Franco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY re #35 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/5/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 5, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 34 STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order, filed by Cangas, Christensen, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong, Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 8/4/2009) Modified on 8/5/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2009 Filing 33 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCity of Eureka, California, Brian Franco, Tim Jones, Adam Laird, Josh Siipola, Steven Watson, Gary E. Whitmer, Justin Winkle. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 16, 2009 Filing 32 Declaration of Fungula Fumu Ngondii re Guardian Ad Litem for Siehna M. Cotton, Sr. as Successors in Interest (C.C.P. Section 377.32), filed by Martin Cotton, Sr, Siehna M. Cotton (Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 6/16/2009) Modified on 6/17/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2009 Filing 31 Answer to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Hagen, Paul) (Filed on 6/3/2009) Modified on 6/4/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: That Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within (20) twenty-days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstong, on 6/1/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009) Modified on 6/2/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2009 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Tim Jones, Gary E. Whitmer. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 28 STIPULATION re Defendants' Responsive Pleadings to Amended Complaint, filed by Siehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr., Martin Cotton, Sr., Cangas, Christensen, City of Eureka, California, Corporal Griffin, Siehna M. Cotton, County of Humboldt, California, Brian Franco, Adam Laird, Morgan, Rissiter, Josh Siipola, Strong, Steven Watson, Justin Winkle (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 5/27/2009) Modified on 5/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2009 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT; with jury demand, against County of Humboldt, California, Justin Winkle, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Josh Siipola, Brian Franco, Griffin Corporal, Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong, City of Eureka, California, Tim Jones, Justin Winkle. Filed by Siehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Summons on First Amended Complaint)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 5/21/2009) Modified on 5/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/22/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING #25 Stipulation to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint shall be filed within (5) five-days of the date of the this Order. Defendants responsive pleading due within (20) twenty-days of this Order. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/19/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009) Modified on 5/21/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2009 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Amend the Complaint, filed by Siehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr., City of Eureka, Justin Winkle, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Josh Siipola, Brian Franco, County of Humboldt, Griffin, Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Request to Amend the Complaint)(Sarmiento, Vicki) (Filed on 5/15/2009) Modified on 5/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/12/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009) Modified on 5/13/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/15/2009. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2010 08:30 AM. Motions due by 2/23/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2010 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/9/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 8, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Settlement (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 8, 2009 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/8/2009 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. General Discovery Cut-off 12/15/09; Motion Cut-off 02/23/10; Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 03/30/10 at 1:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 04/05/10 at 8:30 AM. Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, which is to be held between 02/24/10 and 03/09/10. Amended Complaint due no later than 05/29/09. (Date Filed: 4/8/2009). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2009) Modified on 4/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cangas, Christensen, Martin Cotton, Sr., Siehna M. Cotton, County of Humboldt, California, Corporal Griffin, Morgan, Justin Winkle, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Josh Siipola, Brian Franco, City of Eureka, California, Rissiter, Strong. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 3/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2009 Filing 20 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Siehna M. Cotton. (Claypool, Brian) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Edward Claypool (Claypool, Brian) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: The Telephonic Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 4/8/2009 at 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/9/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2009 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference and Proposed Order, filed by Martin Cotton, Sr., Cangas, Christensen, City of Eureka, California, Corporal Griffin, Siehna M. Cotton, County of Humboldt, California, Brian Franco, Adam Laird, Morgan, Rissiter, Josh Siipola, Strong, Steven Watson, Justin Winkle (Claypool, Brian) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Modified on 2/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2009 Filing 16 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE IGNORE*** STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Martin Cotton, Sr. (Claypool, Brian) (Filed on 2/5/2009) Modified on 2/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Robert Maier and Louis Elwood Shoch terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 14 Proposed Order re #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney As Co-Counsel Of Record by Siehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr. (Maier, Eric) (Filed on 1/26/2009) Modified on 1/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney As Co-Counsel Of Record filed by Siehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr. (Maier, Eric) (Filed on 1/26/2009) Modified on 1/27/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2009 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 11 ADR Clerk's Notice Re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ls7, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 29, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Robert Maier (Maier, Eric) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint byCounty of Humboldt, California, Griffin Corporal, Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byJustin Winkle, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Josh Siipola, Brian Franco, City of Eureka, California. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by County of Humboldt, California, Griffin Corporal, Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong. (Bragg, William) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2009 03:00 PM.VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/20/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008) Modified on 11/21/2008 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/10/08. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 3 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by City of Eureka, California. (Delaney, Nancy) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2008. Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2008 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/08. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against County of Humboldt, California, Justin Winkle, Adam Laird, Steven Watson, Josh Siipola, Brian Franco, Griffin Corporal, Cangas, Christensen, Morgan, Rissiter, Strong, City of Eureka, California ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611023544.). Filed bySiehna M. Cotton, Martin Cotton, Sr. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2008: #1 Summons) (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton et al v. City of Eureka, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Cotton, Sr.
Represented By: Brian Edward Claypool
Represented By: Dale Kristopher Galipo
Represented By: Vicki Ingrid Sarmiento
Represented By: Eric Robert Maier
Represented By: Louis Elwood Shoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siehna M. Cotton
Represented By: Eric Robert Maier
Represented By: Louis Elwood Shoch
Represented By: Brian Edward Claypool
Represented By: Dale Kristopher Galipo
Represented By: Vicki Ingrid Sarmiento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF Officer Cangas
Represented By: William Robert Bragg
Represented By: Paul Michael Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF Officer Christensen
Represented By: William Robert Bragg
Represented By: Paul Michael Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eureka, California
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Represented By: Suzanne Michelle Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Humboldt, California
Represented By: William Robert Bragg
Represented By: Paul Michael Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Franco
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Griffin
Represented By: William Robert Bragg
Represented By: Paul Michael Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Jones
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Laird
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Represented By: Suzanne Michelle Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF Officer Morgan
Represented By: William Robert Bragg
Represented By: Paul Michael Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossiter
Represented By: William Robert Bragg
Represented By: Paul Michael Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Siipola
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCCF Officer Strong
Represented By: William Robert Bragg
Represented By: Paul Michael Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Watson
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary E. Whitmer
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Represented By: Suzanne Michelle Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Winkle
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Kloeppel
Represented By: Suzanne Michelle Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?