Sturgis v. Brady et al
Plaintiff: Lamos Wayne Sturgis
Defendant: Robert Brady, Neece Lafayette, Perrilla, McDevitt and K-9 Doc
Case Number: 4:2008cv05363
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference and Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/31/2015 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 1/28/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SERVE DEFENDANTS NEES AND PARRILLA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/7/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/29/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009) Modified on 5/1/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, GRANTING 4 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) Modified on 2/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgis v. Brady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamos Wayne Sturgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neece Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-9 Doc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?