October 4, 2018 |
Filing
623
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 603 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing
572
ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
|
April 2, 2014 |
Filing
562
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF ARMY'S MARCH 6, 2014 REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/2/2014 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing
558
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 553 MOTION TO STAY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
546
JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/19/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
|
July 24, 2013 |
Filing
537
ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 490 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 495 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing
532
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 527 Motion for Enlargement of Pretrial Schedule. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
|
May 8, 2013 |
Filing
526
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 525 Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
|
April 12, 2013 |
Filing
522
ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/12/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
|
April 10, 2013 |
Filing
520
ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/10/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
|
February 12, 2013 |
Filing
507
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 506 Motion To Reschedule Settlement Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
505
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 504 Stipulation Regarding Settlement Judge Referral. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
|
January 16, 2013 |
Filing
500
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 498 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
|
September 30, 2012 |
Filing
485
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part, and denying in part, 346 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, denying 431 471 Defendants' Motions for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration and for Relief from a Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge, and granting in part, and denying in part, 439 Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2012)
|
September 7, 2012 |
Filing
483
ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 482). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/7/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
481
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS 479 MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions due by 12/5/2012. Responses / Cross Motions due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 2/1/2013. Replies due by 2/22/2013. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2013. Motion Heari ng / Further Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2013 02:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (20 day) 7/29/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
|
August 2, 2012 |
Filing
477
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 471 MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM A NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
|
July 31, 2012 |
Filing
476
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 467). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
470
ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 468). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/19/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
464
Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 451 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
|
June 26, 2012 |
Filing
458
ORDER RELEASING JUNE 21, 2012 HEARING TRANSCRIPT TO THE PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/26/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
457
ORDER RE: MAGNETIC TAPES DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 425). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/22/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
|
June 15, 2012 |
Filing
448
ORDER RE: MAGNETIC TAPES DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 425). Discovery Hearing set for 6/21/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/15/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
|
June 7, 2012 |
Filing
443
ORDER RE: RESPONSES TO COURTS MAY 31, 2012 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/7/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
436
ORDER RE: MAY 30 & 31, 2012 IN CAMERA SUBMISSIONS OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/31/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
|
May 23, 2012 |
Filing
430
ORDER RE: REMAINDER OF MAY 1, 2012 IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/23/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
|
May 22, 2012 |
Filing
429
ORDER RE: MAGNETIC TAPE DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/22/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing
423
ORDER RE: APRIL 12 AND MAY 1, 2012 IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/14/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
420
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 413 Defendant's Motion for Relief From 4/6/2012 Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
|
April 25, 2012 |
Filing
417
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM APRIL 16, 2012 ORDER (Dkt. No. 413). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/25/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
|
April 23, 2012 |
Filing
416
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 413 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
|
April 6, 2012 |
Filing
408
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 404 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
|
April 5, 2012 |
Filing
402
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDERSEAL (Dkt. No. 362). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/5/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
382
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on March 29, 2012. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
|
March 12, 2012 |
Filing
370
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 365 THEIR ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
|
February 29, 2012 |
Filing
361
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 356 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/29/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
354
ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY MOTION. Discovery Hearing set for 4/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/27/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing
352
ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART, PLAINTIFFS 347 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
|
December 15, 2011 |
Filing
336
CLERKS NOTICE DEEMING OBJECTION DENIED re 329 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 327 Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
|
December 6, 2011 |
Filing
331
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 314 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE 295 MOTION TO EXTEND THE CASE DEADLINES. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2012 02:00 PM. Bench Trial (20 day) set for 10/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
|
November 30, 2011 |
Filing
330
ORDER RE: JOINT LETTER CONCERNING DISCOVERY STATUS AND DISPUTES (Dkt. No. 318). Discovery Hearing set for 12/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/30/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
327
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/23/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
|
November 17, 2011 |
Filing
325
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES CONCERNING DEPOSITIONS AND FURTHER DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (Docket No. 307). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/17/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
|
October 25, 2011 |
Filing
311
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/25/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing
304
ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFFS 295 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
303
ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENTS OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES FILED OCTOBER 12, 2011 (Dkt. Nos. 299 & 300). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/14/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
|
October 5, 2011 |
Filing
294
ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (Dkt. No. 252), PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 255), PLAINITFFS MOTION TO COMPEL RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITIONS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Dkt. No. 258), AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY (Dkt. No. 260). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/5/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
281
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELLS 245 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELLS 266 MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER, AND GRANTING 252 SECTION I.A OF CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELLS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
|
August 30, 2011 |
Filing
273
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
|
August 25, 2011 |
Filing
270
ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELL'S 266 MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 8/31/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) Modified on 8/26/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
June 9, 2011 |
Filing
235
ORDER RE JOINT REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION re 234 Letter filed by United States Department of the Army, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Pete Geren, U nited States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Defense, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Leon Panetta, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Central Intelligence Agency, United States of America, Bruce Price, Robert M. Gates, Eric K. Shinseki, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/9/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
|
May 31, 2011 |
Filing
233
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 187 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Part; DENYING 211 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
232
ORDER re 231 Stipulation, filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Central Intelligence Agency, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/24/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
230
ORDER GRANTING 228 Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
|
April 4, 2011 |
Filing
220
ORDER SUA SPONTE STRIKING 219 Letter filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/4/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing
214
ORDER ON BRIEFING REGARDING 187 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition due by 3/22/2011. Defendants' Supplemental Reply due by 3/29/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/8/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
|
March 2, 2011 |
Filing
212
ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/2/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing
204
ORDER Granting 203 Stipulation extending time for new defendants to file answer to re 180 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing
202
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION re 191 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/19/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
|
January 14, 2011 |
Filing
200
ORDER Granting 199 STIPULATED Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents from Docket re 195 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
|
December 6, 2010 |
Filing
186
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 181 Stipulation, filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Central Intelligence Agency, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, Robert M. Gates, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 6, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
|
November 15, 2010 |
Filing
177
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Leave to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
|
October 29, 2010 |
Filing
174
ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/29/10. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing
169
ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 20, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
|
October 7, 2010 |
Filing
159
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 134 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER STAYING FURTHER DISCOVERY AND FOR A MODIFICATION OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing
120
ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/6/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing
86
ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on June 3, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing
75
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 73 Stipulation,, filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, United States Department of Defense, Leon Panetta, United States Department of the Army, Eric H. Holder, Jr., David C. Dufrane, Central Intelligence Agency, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, United States of America, Swords to Plowshares, Vietnam Veterans of America, Robert M. Gates, Wray C. Forrest, Pete Geren, Veterans Rights Organization. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 8, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
|
March 23, 2010 |
Filing
72
ORDER re 70 granting Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/23/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 8, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing
66
ORDER re 65 granting STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests and Produce Documents. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/23/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing
59
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 57 Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing
50
ORDER re 48 GRANTING Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Defendants' 34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting re 41 Stipulation Extending Briefing And Hearing Scheduled ON Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Initial Case Management Conference,,, filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, United States Department of Defen se, Leon Panetta, United States Department of the Army, Eric H. Holder, Jr., David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, United States of America, Swords to Plowshares, Vietnam Veterans of America, Robert M. Gates, Wray C. Forrest, Pete Gere n, Veterans Rights Organization Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Plaintiffs' opposition due: 10/2/09; Defendants' reply due: 10/23/09.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER re 32 granting STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Am. Compl., to Enter Briefing Sch. and to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
|
May 29, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting re 20 Stipulation Re: ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael B. Mukasey, United States of America, Michael V. Hayden, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing
19
ORDER re 18 granting STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Enter Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/12/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
|
March 31, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER re 14 granting STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
|