Villegas v. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Villegas
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A. and Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2009cv00261
Filed: January 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AMENDED ORDER re 182 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/17/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 170 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 176 Motion for Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER re 178 Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 176 MOTION for Settlement , 170 MOTION for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Class Representation Enhancement. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 176 MOTION for Settlement , 170 MOTION for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Class Representation Enhancement. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 166 Ex Parte Application ; granting 168 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 157 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, GRANTING 162 Stipulation to Amend Notice of Pendency of Class Action Settlement. Final Approval and Fairness Hearing set for 01/15/13 at 1:00 PM. Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval and Motion for Attorneys' Fees shall be filed (35) thirty-five-days prior to the Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/08/12 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) Modified on 8/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 155 Stipulation, filed by Nicole Villegas. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/3/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion due by 9/27/11. Responses due by 10/11/2011. Replies due by 10/25/2011.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/1/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2011 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 144 Stipulation and Order, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/19/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 134 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 Stipulation, filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Chase Bank USA, Nicole Villegas. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/3/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re 126 Amended Document, filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Chase Bank USA, Nicole Villegas, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/5/2011. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2012 08:30 AM. Motions due by 9/20/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 1/9/2012 08:30AM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Stipulation and Order Continuing Settlement Conference from 09/03/10 to 11/16/10 re 118 Stipulation filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Chase Bank USA, Nicole Villegas. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/28/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting hearing on 113 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Nicole Villegas, 112 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's 3/26/10 Order filed by Nicole Villegas. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/20/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the deadline for parties to participate in court-sponsored mediation has been EXTENED to 12/18/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010) Modified on 5/20/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re 101 , 104 Cross-Briefs on Adequacy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010) Modified on 3/29/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/7/2011. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2011 08:30 AM. Motions due by 2/15/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2011 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the current briefing and hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents has been CONTINUED as follows: Defendants' Document Production Deadline is 02/15/10; Cross-Briefs Deadline 02/24/10; Hearing on Cross-Briefs Deadline 03/03/10 at 3;00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 78 Motion to Compel and Motion for Evidentiary and Preclusive Sanctions. Cross-briefs hearing set for 02/24/10 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen, on 1/28/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010) Modified on 1/29/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 Stipulation, filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Chase Bank USA, Nicole Villegas. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen, on 5/27/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009) Modified on 5/29/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 28 Case Management Scheduling Order, Settlement Conference set for 8/17/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 5/26/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villegas v. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Villegas
Represented By: Kenneth H Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Lauren Sunley Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Lauren Sunley Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Lauren Sunley Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?