Crook v. Szopinski et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Crook
Defendant: Steven Szopinski, M. Contreras, B. Ko, S Wong, M Valle, P. Balzouman, E. Taupal, C Wong and City Of Oakland
Case Number: 4:2009cv00431
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/4/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/27/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RE-SERVICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER ON PRO SE PLAINTIFF, RODERICK CROOK DUE TO NOTIFICATION OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 07-30/10 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 03/18/2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/15/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009) Modified on 6/16/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crook v. Szopinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Szopinski
Represented By: Eugene Burton Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Contreras
Represented By: Rachel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Ko
Represented By: Rachel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Wong
Represented By: Rachel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Valle
Represented By: Rachel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Balzouman
Represented By: Rachel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Taupal
Represented By: Rachel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Wong
Represented By: Rachel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Eugene Burton Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?